Redenbaugh v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Redenbaugh
Defendant: Fidelity Investments Life Insurance Co., Prudential Insurance Co. of America and Pfizer, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv01106
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Broomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue. Prudential shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before June 11, 2021. Plaintiff shall respond to #4 Pfizer's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue, on or before June 18, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/28/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
May 27, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, , Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue MOTION to Change Venue ( Response deadline 6/10/2021) by Defendant Prudential Insurance Co. of America (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Bien, Richard)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Defendant Prudential Insurance Co. of America's Consented Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendant Prudential Insurance Co. of America shall have up to and including Friday, May 28, 2021, in which to Answer, Respond or Otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/14/21. (adc)
May 13, 2021 Filing 12 Alias SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED upon Kansas Commissioner of Insurance on 4/1/2021. Pursuant to K.S.A. 40-218, a copy was forwarded by certified mail, return receipt requested to: Fidelity Investments Life Insurance Company. (Filed in McPherson County District Court on 4/07/2021; See Doc #9 for pleading.) (mls)
May 13, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, - Consented Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Respond and/or Otherwise Plead and Memorandum in Support - by Defendant Prudential Insurance Co. of America (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Bien, Richard)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORDS from McPherson County District Court. (DeGraffenreid, Jeff)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue MOTION to Change Venue. Response deadline 6/4/2021. Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 05/05/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
May 4, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue MOTION to Change Venue, #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3 Designation of Place of Trial by Plaintiff Shannon Redenbaugh. (Neustrom, Patrik)
May 4, 2021 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #7 Proposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue MOTION to Change Venue, #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3 Designation of Place of Trial. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (kf)
April 30, 2021 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 5/17/2021 for Defendant Prudential Insurance Co. of America to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/30/2021. (jk)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by Defendant Pfizer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(DeGraffenreid, Jeff)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by Defendant Pfizer, Inc. (DeGraffenreid, Jeff). Added MOTION to Change Venue on 4/30/2021 (mls).
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Pfizer, Inc. - trial to be held in Wichita. (DeGraffenreid, Jeff)
April 23, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Pfizer, Inc.. (DeGraffenreid, Jeff)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from McPherson County District Court, case number 21-CV-16 Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5469695.), filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(DeGraffenreid, Jeff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redenbaugh v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Investments Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Co. of America
Represented By: Richard N. Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Jeff P. DeGraffenreid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Redenbaugh
Represented By: Patrik W. Neustrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?