McClarin V. United States of America
Plaintiff: James J. McClarin, III
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 6:2021cv01124
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting, for good cause shown and as unopposed, #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Answer of United States of America due on or before 7/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/25/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
May 25, 2021 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant United States of America (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Morehead, Terra)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John S. Kanzler for James J. McClarin, III pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/25/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
May 25, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney John S. Kanzler to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5496529.) by Plaintiff James J. McClarin, III (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Goza, Kirk)
May 17, 2021 Filing 14 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kirk J. Goza on behalf of James J. McClarin, III (Goza, Kirk)
May 6, 2021 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Terra D. Morehead on behalf of United States of America. (Morehead, Terra)
May 6, 2021 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brian D. Sheern on behalf of United States of America (Sheern, Brian)
May 5, 2021 Filing 11 Letter to counsel of record regarding pro hac vice requirements. (sz)
May 5, 2021 Filing 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-05380. Electronic file of transfer order and docket sheet received. (sz)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE CLERK SHALL TAKE ALL NECESSARY STEPS TO EXPEDITIOUSLY TRANSFER THIS ACTION TO THE DISTRICT OF KANSAS. UNLESS OTHERWISE ORDERED BY THE DISTRICT COURT IN THE DISTRICT OF KANSAS, DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 30 DAYS AFTER DEFENDANT RECEIVES NOTIFICATION THAT THIS ACTION IS PENDING IN THE DISTRICT OF KANSAS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/17/21. 3/17/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/5/2021.]
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Desiree Williams re: served Summons, Complaint, Notice of a Lawsuit, and Waivers of Service upon William M. McSwain and William P. Barr by Certified Mail-Return Receipt Requested on 12/21/2020 (BALDINO, GERALD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/5/2021.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOEL M. SWEET on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Certificate of Service(SWEET, JOEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/5/2021.]
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S #5 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JOHN S. KANZLER, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 11/12/20.11/12/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/5/2021.]
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice to Admit John S. Kanzler, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14701415.) filed by JAMES J. MCCLARIN, III.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BALDINO, GERALD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/5/2021.]
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE #3 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE SUBJECT TO SUBMISSION OF THE REQUIRED FILING FEE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 11/9/20.11/9/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/5/2021.]
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice to Admit John S. Kanzler, Esquire filed by JAMES J. MCCLARIN, III.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BALDINO, GERALD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/5/2021.]
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HON. CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 11/4/20. 11/4/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/5/2021.]
November 2, 2020 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 11/2/2020 (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/5/2021.]
October 28, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JAMES J. MCCLARIN, III. (JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/5/2021.]
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14672111.), filed by James McClarin, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(BALDINO, GERALD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/5/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClarin V. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J. McClarin, III
Represented By: John S. Kanzler
Represented By: Kirk J. Goza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: JOEL M. SWEET
Represented By: Terra D. Morehead
Represented By: Brian D. Sheern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?