Simmons et al v. Ganley et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Simmons and Catherine Simmons
Defendant: Darnell B. Ganley, Elizabeth A. Doyle and Joshua A. Hartman
Case Number: 6:2021cv01130
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 7/20/2021. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 8/3/2021. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 8/3/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 8/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/29/2021. (ht)
June 29, 2021 Filing 18 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Elizabeth A. Doyle - trial to be held in Wichita. (Cole, Christopher)
June 29, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Elizabeth A. Doyle.(Cole, Christopher)
June 28, 2021 Filing 16 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Steven C. Day on behalf of Elizabeth A. Doyle. (Day, Steven)
June 28, 2021 Filing 15 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Christopher S. Cole on behalf of Elizabeth A. Doyle. (Cole, Christopher)
June 22, 2021 Filing 14 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Joshua A. Hartman - trial to be held in Wichita. (Troutt, Randy)
June 22, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Joshua A. Hartman.(Troutt, Randy)
June 22, 2021 Filing 12 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Darnell B. Ganley - trial to be held in Wichita. (Maloney, Mark)
June 22, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Darnell B. Ganley.(Maloney, Mark)
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mark R. Maloney on behalf of Darnell B. Ganley. (Maloney, Mark)
June 15, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Jeffrey Simmons, Catherine Simmons upon Darnell B. Ganley served on 5/29/2021, answer due 6/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt Card)(Dwyer, Matthew)
June 10, 2021 Filing 8 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 6/24/2021 for Defendant Joshua A. Hartman to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/10/2021. (jk)
June 10, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Randy J. Troutt on behalf of Joshua A. Hartman. (Troutt, Randy)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jeffrey Simmons, Catherine Simmons upon Elizabeth A. Doyle served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021 (Dwyer, Matthew)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Copy of Complaint on Kansas Health Care Stabilization Fund by Catherine Simmons, Jeffrey Simmons (Attachments: #1 Envelope Return Receipt Card)(Dwyer, Matthew)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Jeffrey Simmons, Catherine Simmons upon Joshua A. Hartman served on 5/20/2021, answer due 6/10/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt Card)(Dwyer, Matthew)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Simmons, Catherine Simmons. (Hayes, J.)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Simmons, Catherine Simmons - trial to be held in Wichita. (Hayes, J.)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5490195.), filed by Jeffrey Simmons, Catherine Simmons. (Hayes, J.)
May 17, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elizabeth A. Doyle, Darnell B. Ganley, Joshua A. Hartman -- issued to Attorney for service. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
May 17, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons et al v. Ganley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Simmons
Represented By: Blake A. Shuart
Represented By: Mark B. Hutton
Represented By: Matthew M. Dwyer
Represented By: J. Darin Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Simmons
Represented By: Blake A. Shuart
Represented By: Mark B. Hutton
Represented By: Matthew M. Dwyer
Represented By: J. Darin Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darnell B. Ganley
Represented By: Brian L. White
Represented By: Mark R. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth A. Doyle
Represented By: Christopher S. Cole
Represented By: Steven C. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua A. Hartman
Represented By: Randy J. Troutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?