Meixell v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Victoria Meixell
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 6:2021cv01136
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Unopposed First Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and Certified Administrative Record and the filing deadline is extended to 9/24/2021. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/20/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Ridgell-Boltz, Laura)
July 19, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: On July 9, 2021, Kilolo Kijakazi was named acting Commissioner of Social Security replacing Andrew M. Saul. The party text for the defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, has been updated to reflect this change. (msb)
June 22, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed -- Office of the Regional Counsel served by Certified Mail on 6/16/2021. (jk)
June 7, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney General served by Certified Mail on 6/2/2021. (jk)
May 26, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney served by Personal Service on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (jk)
May 25, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to US Marshal for service). (jk)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons to the US Marshal or Deputy Marshal, who are appointed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3). Plaintiff(s) or plaintiff(s) counsel directed to IMMEDIATELY prepare and submit summon(s) to the Clerk for service. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/24/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Victoria Meixell. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (Overton, Kathleen)
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Victoria Meixell - trial to be held in Wichita. (Overton, Kathleen)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Victoria Meixell. (Overton, Kathleen)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Victoria Meixell.(Overton, Kathleen)
May 21, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meixell v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Represented By: Laura Ridgell-Boltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Meixell
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?