Brozek v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Rodney L Brozek and Rodney L. Brozek
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, US Attorney General and US Attorney, Kansas
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 6:2021cv01162
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney General served by Certified Mail on 7/26/2021. (jk)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed -- Office of the Regional Counsel served by Certified Mail on 7/19/2021. (jk)
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney served by Personal Service on 7/19/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (jk)
July 14, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to US Marshal for service). (jk)
July 13, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: On July 9, 2021, Kilolo Kijakazi was named acting Commissioner of Social Security replacing Andrew M. Saul. The party text for the defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, has been updated to reflect this change. (heo)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons to the US Marshal or Deputy Marshal, who are appointed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3). Plaintiff(s) or plaintiff(s) counsel directed to IMMEDIATELY prepare and submit summon(s) to the Clerk for service. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/12/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Rodney L. Brozek. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of financial status)(Nations, Karen) (Modified on 7/13/2021 to correct title. (heo))
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice to reapplying the #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff does not clarify these ambiguities and reapply by July 16, 2021, the filing fee in this case shall be paid no later than July 30, 2021. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 06/28/2021. (ses)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Rodney L. Brozek - trial to be held in Wichita. (Nations, Karen)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Rodney L. Brozek. (Nations, Karen)
June 25, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Rodney L Brozek (Attachments: #1 Affidavit affidavit in support of motion)(Nations, Karen)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Rodney L Brozek.(Nations, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brozek v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney L Brozek
Represented By: Karen Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney L. Brozek
Represented By: Karen Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney, Kansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?