Dotson v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Plaintiff: Leon Dotson
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Case Number: 6:2021cv01224
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I..(Severson, Brooks)
November 5, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., filed by Leon Dotson.(Barr, William)
November 4, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Mark Meyer as to American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (Meyer, Mark)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 4/15/2022. Mediation deadline 12/16/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/29/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2022 at 11:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Dispositive motion deadline 6/1/2022. Jury Trial set for 2/7/2023 at 9:00 AM in Wichita Courtroom (Unknown) before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/4/21. (ss)
November 4, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 11/4/2021. (AT&T conference line.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
November 2, 2021 Filing 17 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brooks G. Severson on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Severson, Brooks)
October 29, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Discovery Responses to Defendant by Leon Dotson (Barr, William)
October 26, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures to Defendant by Leon Dotson. (Barr, William)
October 21, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Certificate of Service of Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Meyer, Mark)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #12 defendant's unopposed motion for protective order, with modifications to paragraphs 7 and 18 to comply with the District of Kansas Guidelines for Agreed Protective Orders and consistent with the prevailing law. Should these modifications change either party's desire for an agreed protective order, the court will favorably entertain a motion to vacate the order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/20/2021. (srj)
October 19, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Meyer, Mark)
October 12, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Discovery Requests to Defendant by Leon Dotson. (Barr, William)
October 11, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. of taking deposition of Leon Dotson on 11/11/2021 (Meyer, Mark)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by William LeFevre Barr, Jr on behalf of Leon Dotson. (Barr, William)
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing CHANGE: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2021 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. All parties participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. The planning report and disclosures will remain due on 10/26/21.(ss)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. identifying None as corporate parent . (Meyer, Mark)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2021 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 10/26/2021. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/26/2021. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/1/21. (ss)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. of Interrogatories and Request for Production (Meyer, Mark)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I..(Meyer, Mark)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Leon Dotson upon American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Barr, William)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Leon Dotson. (Barr, William)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5587832.), filed by Leon Dotson.(Barr, William)
September 15, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
September 15, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dotson v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Dotson
Represented By: Tony L. Atterbury
Represented By: William LeFevre Barr, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Represented By: Brooks G. Severson
Represented By: Mark E. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?