Elk Energy Holdings, LLC v. Lippelmann Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Elk Energy Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Lippelmann Partners, LLC, Tony Kawaguchi, Luke Hofacker, Rajinikanth Gurusankarnath, Ron Hellwig, The Venkasteswahan Trust, Raphael Ospina, Curtis McGhee, xSeed, LLC, Swarnalatha Sridhar, Stanley White, Robert C. Gregg and Christine L. Gregg Trust, Rhodes Lippelmann, LLC, Philip Mosier, Jerry Davis, Investar Ventures LLC, Cottonwood Resources LLC, Banman Lippelmann LLC, Philip Whitmore, Kim Wohlhuter, Jewel Tankard and Venkasteswahan Trust, The
Case Number: 6:2022cv01057
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 5/09/2022 for Defendant Lippelmann Partners, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/21/2022. (jk)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Neil C. Gosch on behalf of Lippelmann Partners, LLC (Gosch, Neil)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Elk Energy Holdings, LLC of Summons and Complaint via Certified Mail (Griffin, William)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Answer of Banman Lippelmann LLC, Cottonwood Resources LLC. Jerry Davis, Rajinikanth Gurusankarnath, Ron Hellwig, Luke Hofacker, Investar Ventures LLC, Tony Kawaguchi, Curtis McGhee, Raphael Ospina, Robert C. Gregg and Christine L. Gregg Trust, Jewel Tankard, Philip Whitmore, Kim Wohlhuter, and xSeed, LLC due on or before 5/2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/18/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendants Banman Lippelmann LLC, Cottonwood Resources LLC, Jerry Davis, Rajinikanth Gurusankarnath, Ron Hellwig, Luke Hofacker, Investar Ventures LLC, Tony Kawaguchi, Curtis McGhee, Raphael Ospina, Robert C. Gregg and Christine L. Gregg Trust, Jewel Tankard, Philip Whitmore, Kim Wohlhuter, xSeed, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Harper, Kurt)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 4/18/2022 for Defendants Kim Wohlhuter, Investar Ventures LLC, Jewel Tankard, Cottonwood Resources LLC, Robert C. Gregg and Christine L. Gregg Trust, Jerry Davis, Ron Hellwig, Tony Kawaguchi, Curtis McGhee, Philip Whitmore, Raphael Ospina, Luke Hofacker, Banman Lippelmann LLC, xSeed, LLC, Rajinikanth Gurusankarnath to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/04/2022. (jk)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kurt A. Harper on behalf of Banman Lippelmann LLC, Cottonwood Resources LLC, Jerry Davis, Rajinikanth Gurusankarnath, Ron Hellwig, Luke Hofacker, Investar Ventures LLC, Tony Kawaguchi, Curtis McGhee, Raphael Ospina, Robert C. Gregg and Christine L. Gregg Trust, Jewel Tankard, Philip Whitmore, Kim Wohlhuter, xSeed, LLC. (Harper, Kurt)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RECEIPT for Interpleader Deposits in the amount of $97,908.49 - receipt number W4631027815, and in the amount of $192,730.62 - receipt number W4631027816. (jk)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Deposit Interpleader Funds pursuant to 28 USC 1335. Authorized deposit in the amount of $97,908.49 currently in plaintiff's possession, as well as future months' revenue owed to defendants. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 3/23/2022. (kas)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Marisol Garcia on behalf of Elk Energy Holdings, LLC. (Garcia, Marisol)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Banman Lippelmann LLC, Cottonwood Resources LLC, Jerry Davis, Rajinikanth Gurusankarnath, Ron Hellwig, Luke Hofacker, Investar Ventures LLC, Tony Kawaguchi, Lippelmann Partners, LLC, Curtis McGhee, Philip Mosier, Raphael Ospina, Rhodes Lippelmann, LLC, Robert C. Gregg and Christine L. Gregg Trust, Swarnalatha Sridhar, Jewel Tankard, Venkasteswahan Trust, The, Stanley White, Philip Whitmore, Kim Wohlhuter, xSeed, LLC (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #5 MOTION to Deposit Interpleader Funds pursuant to 28 USC 1335 . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Deposit Interpleader Funds pursuant to 28 USC 1335 by Plaintiff Elk Energy Holdings, LLC (Griffin, William)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Elk Energy Holdings, LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Griffin, William)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Elk Energy Holdings, LLC - trial to be held in Wichita. (Griffin, William)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Elk Energy Holdings, LLC. (Griffin, William)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5724506.), filed by Elk Energy Holdings, LLC. (Griffin, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elk Energy Holdings, LLC v. Lippelmann Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elk Energy Holdings, LLC
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Represented By: Marisol Garcia
Represented By: Samantha M. H. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lippelmann Partners, LLC
Represented By: Neil C. Gosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Kawaguchi
Represented By: Kurt A. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Hofacker
Represented By: Kurt A. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajinikanth Gurusankarnath
Represented By: Kurt A. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Hellwig
Represented By: Kurt A. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Venkasteswahan Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raphael Ospina
Represented By: Kurt A. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis McGhee
Represented By: Kurt A. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xSeed, LLC
Represented By: Kurt A. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swarnalatha Sridhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Gregg and Christine L. Gregg Trust
Represented By: Kurt A. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Lippelmann, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Mosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Davis
Represented By: Kurt A. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investar Ventures LLC
Represented By: Kurt A. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottonwood Resources LLC
Represented By: Kurt A. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banman Lippelmann LLC
Represented By: Kurt A. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Whitmore
Represented By: Kurt A. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Wohlhuter
Represented By: Kurt A. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jewel Tankard
Represented By: Kurt A. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venkasteswahan Trust, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?