Teetz v. Sedgwick County, Kansas et al
Plaintiff: Marquan Teetz
Defendant: Sedgwick County, Kansas, Jason Stepien, Brenton Newby, Karen Conklin, Billy Buckner, Benny Mendoza, Wichita, Kansas, City of and John Doe Wichita Police Department Officers 1-10
Case Number: 6:2022cv01134
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marquan Teetz. Sedgwick County, Kansas waiver sent on 6/29/2022, answer due 8/29/2022. (Stelter-Embry, Benjamin)
July 15, 2022 Filing 16 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Allen G. Glendenning on behalf of Billy Buckner, Karen Conklin, Benny Mendoza, Brenton Newby, Jason Stepien. (Glendenning, Allen)
July 15, 2022 Filing 15 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey M. Kuhlman on behalf of Billy Buckner, Karen Conklin, Benny Mendoza, Brenton Newby, Jason Stepien. (Kuhlman, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marquan Teetz. Brenton Newby waiver sent on 7/11/2022, answer due 9/9/2022. (Stelter-Embry, Benjamin)
July 13, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marquan Teetz. Karen Conklin waiver sent on 7/11/2022, answer due 9/9/2022. (Stelter-Embry, Benjamin)
July 13, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marquan Teetz. Billy Buckner waiver sent on 7/11/2022, answer due 9/9/2022. (Stelter-Embry, Benjamin)
July 13, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marquan Teetz. Jason Stepien waiver sent on 7/11/2022, answer due 9/9/2022. (Stelter-Embry, Benjamin)
July 13, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marquan Teetz. Benny Mendoza waiver sent on 7/11/2022, answer due 9/9/2022. (Stelter-Embry, Benjamin)
July 12, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marquan Teetz. Wichita, Kansas, City of waiver sent on 6/29/2022, answer due 8/29/2022. (Stelter-Embry, Benjamin)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John S. Marrese for Marquan Teetz pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/22/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven A. Hart for Marquan Teetz pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/22/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew M. Stroth for Marquan Teetz pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/22/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
June 22, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney John S. Marrese to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5806596.) by Plaintiff Marquan Teetz. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Stelter-Embry, Benjamin)
June 22, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Steven A. Hart to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5806575.) by Plaintiff Marquan Teetz. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Stelter-Embry, Benjamin)
June 22, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Andrew M. Stroth to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5806559.) by Plaintiff Marquan Teetz. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Stelter-Embry, Benjamin)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Marquan Teetz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Attorneys)(Stelter-Embry, Benjamin)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5799789.), filed by Marquan Teetz. (Stelter-Embry, Benjamin)
June 13, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
June 13, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing, civil cover sheet is missing, and document is not redacted properly. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teetz v. Sedgwick County, Kansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquan Teetz
Represented By: Benjamin A. Stelter-Embry
Represented By: Andrew M. Stroth
Represented By: John S. Marrese
Represented By: Steven A. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick County, Kansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Stepien
Represented By: Allen G. Glendenning
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenton Newby
Represented By: Allen G. Glendenning
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Conklin
Represented By: Allen G. Glendenning
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Buckner
Represented By: Allen G. Glendenning
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benny Mendoza
Represented By: Allen G. Glendenning
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita, Kansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Wichita Police Department Officers 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?