Ayers v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Donald Lynn Ayers
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 6:2022cv01197
Filed: August 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2022 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Marc Thayne Warner on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Warner, Marc)
September 23, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed -- Office of the Regional Counsel served by Certified Mail on 9/12/2022. (jk)
September 23, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney General served by Certified Mail on 9/13/2022. (jk)
September 12, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney served by Personal Service on 9/8/2022, answer due 11/7/2022. (jk)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons to the US Marshal or Deputy Marshal, who are appointed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3). Plaintiff(s) or plaintiff(s) counsel directed to IMMEDIATELY prepare and submit summon(s) to the Clerk for service. Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 09/07/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
September 7, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to US Marshal for service) (jsh)
August 30, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Donald Lynn Ayers. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (Young, Kelsey)
August 30, 2022 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Donald Lynn Ayers - trial to be held in Wichita. (Young, Kelsey)
August 30, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Donald Lynn Ayers. (Young, Kelsey)
August 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Donald Lynn Ayers.(Young, Kelsey)
August 30, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayers v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Lynn Ayers
Represented By: Kelsey Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Represented By: Marc Thayne Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?