Dlayal Holdings, Inc. v. Gracey et al
Plaintiff: Dlayal Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Rodger Gracey, Marnie Gracey and Estate of Betty Gracey
Case Number: 6:2022cv01265
Filed: November 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Broomes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Defendants' Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #16 Amended Complaint. The deadline for all Defendants to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is extended until 14 days after the District Judge rules on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay (ECF No. 13). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/18/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kf)
January 13, 2023 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #16 Amended Complaint by Defendant Marnie Gracey (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Phelps, Justen)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER finding as moot #15 Defendants' Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answers. Plaintiff has filed an Amended Complaint (ECF No. 16) thus the complaint Defendants sought an extension of time to answer is no longer the operative complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/6/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kf)
January 6, 2023 Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against Estate of Betty Gracey, Marnie Gracey, Rodger Gracey, filed by Dlayal Holdings, Inc. (Fowler, Jay)
January 6, 2023 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Marnie Gracey (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Phelps, Justen)
January 6, 2023 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay by Defendant Marnie Gracey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List Index of Exhibits, #2 Ex. 1, #3 Ex. 2, #4 Ex. 3, #5 Ex. 4, #6 Ex. 5, #7 Ex. 6, #8 Ex. 7, #9 Ex. 8, #10 Ex. 9, #11 Ex. 10, #12 Ex. 11, #13 Ex. 12, #14 Ex. 13, #15 Ex. 14, #16 Ex. 15, #17 Ex. 16, #18 Ex. 17, #19 Ex. 18, #20 Ex. 19)(Phelps, Justen)
January 6, 2023 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay by Defendant Marnie Gracey (Phelps, Justen). Added MOTION to Stay Case (mls).
December 21, 2022 Filing 12 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 1/6/2023 for Defendant Marnie Gracey to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/21/2022. (jsh)
December 21, 2022 Filing 11 (DISREGARD, filed in error.) -- MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant Marnie Gracey. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Phelps, Justen) Modified on 12/21/2022 -- Counsel notified, clerk's extensions should be emailed directly to the clerk's office. (mam)
December 21, 2022 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Justen P. Phelps on behalf of Marnie Gracey. (Phelps, Justen)
December 19, 2022 Filing 9 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 1/6/2023 for Defendants Estate of Betty Gracey, Rodger Gracey to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/19/2022. (jsh)
December 19, 2022 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Robert R. Eisenhauer on behalf of Estate of Betty Gracey, Rodger Gracey. (Eisenhauer, Robert)
December 8, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Dlayal Holdings, Inc. upon Rodger Gracey served on 12/2/2022, answer due 12/23/2022 (Fowler, Jay)
December 8, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Dlayal Holdings, Inc. upon Estate of Betty Gracey served on 12/2/2022, answer due 12/23/2022 (Fowler, Jay)
December 8, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Dlayal Holdings, Inc. upon Marnie Gracey served on 12/2/2022, answer due 12/23/2022 (Fowler, Jay)
December 8, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dlayal Holdings, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent (Fowler, Jay)
November 29, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Estate of Betty Gracey, Marnie Gracey, Rodger Gracey (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
November 23, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Dlayal Holdings, Inc. (Fowler, Jay)
November 23, 2022 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Dlayal Holdings, Inc. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Fowler, Jay)
November 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5924894.), filed by Dlayal Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Ex. E) (Fowler, Jay)
November 23, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dlayal Holdings, Inc. v. Gracey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dlayal Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Walenz
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodger Gracey
Represented By: Robert R. Eisenhauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marnie Gracey
Represented By: Justen P. Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Betty Gracey
Represented By: Robert R. Eisenhauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?