PHH Mortgage Corporation v. Stuber et al
Plaintiff: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: Joseph Scott Stuber, Scott Stuber, Joseph S. Stuber, J. S. Stuber, J. Scott Stuber, John Doe, Jane Doe, Chisholm Creek Condominium Homeowners Association, Esther Kay Manns, Unknown Heirs, executors, Administrators, devisees, trustees, Creditors, and assigns of Any deceased defendants, the, unknown spouses of any defendants, the, Unknown executors, administrators, devisees, trustees, creditors, successors and assigns of any defendants that are or were partners or in partnership and unknown guardians, conservators and trustees of any defendants that are minors or are under any legal disability and all other person who are or may be concerned, the
Case Number: 6:2023cv01123
Filed: June 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion to Deny Defendant Joseph Stuber's Motion to Dismiss as Moot, or Alternatively for Additional Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #12 ) is denied in part and granted in part. Plaintiff has until 8/29/2023, to respond to the pending Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #5 ). Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 8/10/2023. (mam)
August 10, 2023 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document #14 Memorandum and Order mailed to Joseph Scott Stuber on 8/10/2023 by regular mail. (mam)
August 8, 2023 Filing 13 SERVICE BY PUBLICATION filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. Last publication date 08/01/2023. (Doornink, Chad)
August 7, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Order denying Defendant Joseph Stuber's Motion to Dismiss as Moot, or Alternatively for Additional Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff PHH Mortgage Corporation (Nichols, Justin)
August 7, 2023 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document #11 Notice and Order to Show Cause mailed to Joseph Scott Stuber on 8/7/2023 by regular mail. (mam)
August 7, 2023 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #12 MOTION for Order denying Defendant Joseph Stuber's Motion to Dismiss as Moot, or Alternatively for Additional Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(byk)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On or before 8/25/2023, Plaintiff PHH Mortgage Corporation shall either file an amended complaint that alleges the citizenship of all parties, or file a response to this order showing good cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/4/2023. (byk)
July 18, 2023 Filing 10 SERVICE BY PUBLICATION filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. Last publication date 08/01/2023. (Doornink, Chad)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Joseph Stuber's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #5 ). The Response deadline is extended to August 7, 2023. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 07/18/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
July 17, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff PHH Mortgage Corporation (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Nichols, Justin)
July 17, 2023 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(byk)
July 14, 2023 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Grant Berning on behalf of PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Berning, Grant)
July 14, 2023 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Justin M. Nichols on behalf of PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Nichols, Justin)
July 3, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Joseph Scott Stuber. (sz)
June 21, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chisholm Creek Condominium Homeowners Association, Jane Doe, John Doe, Esther Kay Manns (to two different addresses), Joseph Scott Stuber (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
June 20, 2023 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff PHH Mortgage Corporation - trial to be held in Wichita. (Doornink, Chad)
June 20, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PHH Mortgage Corporation identifying Ocwen Financial Corporation as corporate parent.(Doornink, Chad)
June 20, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Doornink, Chad)
June 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6088093.), filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Assignment of Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Certificate of Merger)(Doornink, Chad)
June 20, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHH Mortgage Corporation v. Stuber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Scott Stuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Stuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph S. Stuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. S. Stuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Scott Stuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chisholm Creek Condominium Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esther Kay Manns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs, executors, Administrators, devisees, trustees, Creditors, and assigns of Any deceased defendants, the
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: unknown spouses of any defendants, the
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown executors, administrators, devisees, trustees, creditors, successors and assigns of any defendants that are or were partners or in partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: unknown guardians, conservators and trustees of any defendants that are minors or are under any legal disability and all other person who are or may be concerned, the
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Chad R. Doornink
Represented By: Grant Berning
Represented By: Justin M. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?