Ruge v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Ruge
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company and Prairie View, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2023cv01127
Filed: June 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
2 Judge: Rachel E Schwartz
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation notice, or confidential settlement reports to magistrate judge, or a joint email to the Magistrate Judge due on 9/12/2023. Mediation deadline 11/3/2023. Discovery deadline 12/15/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/5/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for January 23, 2024, at 1:30 p.m. by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 5705809) before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz. Dispositive motion deadline 2/16/2024. The court will subsequently set this case for trial. Estimated trial time - 4 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 08/16/2023. (drk)
August 15, 2023 Filing 18 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 8/15/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (drk)
August 4, 2023 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Disclosures by Prairie View, Inc. (Townsley, William)
July 24, 2023 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Michelle Ruge. (Pearce, Derrick)
July 21, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Leopold, Christopher)
July 19, 2023 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Prairie View, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent. (Townsley, William)
July 19, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Prairie View, Inc. (Townsley, William)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for August 15, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 5705809) before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 7/25/2023. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 8/4/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 8/4/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 07/18/2023. (drk)
July 6, 2023 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 7/6/23. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(cs)
July 5, 2023 Filing 10 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 07/19/2023 for Defendant Prairie View, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead Signed by deputy clerk on 7/5/2023. (nao)
July 5, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT TO REMOVE by Prairie View, Inc. (Townsley, William)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (state court petition/notice of removal) #1 . Answer or responsive pleading due on or before July 21, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/23/23. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
June 23, 2023 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale.) (Hanna, William)
June 23, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Leopold, Christopher)
June 23, 2023 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Sumner County, KS. (Leopold, Christopher)
June 23, 2023 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company identifying Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company as corporate parent. (Leopold, Christopher)
June 23, 2023 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company - trial to be held in Wichita. (Leopold, Christopher)
June 23, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Leopold, Christopher)
June 23, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Sumner County, KS, case number SU-2023-CV-000197, trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6090928.), filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court File)(Leopold, Christopher)
June 23, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruge v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Ruge
Represented By: Derrick A. Pearce
Represented By: Kyle Henry Sciolaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: William E. Hanna
Represented By: Christopher J. Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prairie View, Inc.
Represented By: William L. Townsley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?