Slash F. Cattle Company, LLC v. Agridyne, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Slash F. Cattle Company, LLC
Defendant: Agridyne, LLC doing business as Mix 30 and Plains States Commodities, LLC doing business as Mix 30
Case Number: 6:2023cv01197
Filed: September 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Brooks G Severson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time 7-10 days. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 1/10/2024. Mediation deadline 6/3/2024. Discovery deadline 7/29/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/19/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2024 at 02:00 PM in Wichita Room 403 (BGS) before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. Dispositive motion deadline 10/3/2024. See Order for further details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 11/6/2023. (sz)
November 6, 2023 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 11/6/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
October 27, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Slash F. Cattle Company, LLC of Initial Disclosures (Preheim, Lynn)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bailey McGowan for Slash F. Cattle Company, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 10/27/23. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
October 27, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Agridyne, LLC, Plains States Commodities, LLC (Sanders, Scott)
October 27, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Bailey McGowan to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number BKSDC-6187633.) by Plaintiff Slash F. Cattle Company, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Preheim, Lynn)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 Response to #4 Order to show Cause filed by Plains States Commodities, LLC and Agridyne, LLC. The Court has reviewed Defendants' response to the Show Cause Order and finds that the information provided is sufficient for purposes of the Show Cause Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 10/3/23. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
October 2, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #4 Order to Show Cause,, Set Deadlines, by Defendants Agridyne, LLC, Plains States Commodities, LLC (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, Decl. of Patrick M. Collins, #2 Ex. B, Decl. of James G. Timberlake, #3 Ex. C, Decl. of Ross Fisher)(Foulston, Andrew)
October 2, 2023 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Foulston on behalf of Agridyne, LLC, Plains States Commodities, LLC. (Foulston, Andrew)
September 26, 2023 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plains States Commodities, LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Sanders, Scott)
September 26, 2023 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Agridyne, LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Sanders, Scott)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING:Fed. R. Civ. P. 1 mandates the "just, speedy, and inexpensive" determination of this action. With this goal in mind, U.S. Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson will conduct a Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 scheduling conference on November 6, 2023 at 10:00 AM. The attorneys who have entered an appearance and pro se parties must attend the conference in person at the United States District Courthouse, 401 N. Market, Wichita, Kansas, unless at least five (5) days prior to the conference they obtain leave to appear by telephone. Timely requests should be made by e-mailing Judge Severson's chambers at ksd_severson_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov. The requesting party/ies should explain why in-person attendance would be burdensome. If counsel for any party or any pro se party is granted leave to participate by telephone, then all counsel and pro se parties will be notified by docket entry on the ECF system of the call-in number and all will be required to participate by phone in the conference at the scheduled time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 9/25/23. (cc)
September 20, 2023 Filing 6 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Agridyne, LLC, Plains States Commodities, LLC. (Sanders, Scott)
September 20, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Agridyne, LLC.(Sanders, Scott)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SHOW CAUSE ORDER. By 10/3/2023, Defendant shall file a status report, with affidavits attached, properly alleging and demonstrating the citizenship of the three party LLCs and showing cause why the undersigned Magistrate Judge should not recommend that the case be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 9/19/2023. (mam)
September 13, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Agridyne, LLC, Plains States Commodities, LLC. (Sanders, Scott)
September 13, 2023 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Agridyne, LLC, Plains States Commodities, LLC - trial to be held in Wichita. (Sanders, Scott)
September 13, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Stafford County District Court, case number SF-2023-CV-000009 Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6152422.), filed by Agridyne, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Consent to Removal)(Sanders, Scott)
September 13, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slash F. Cattle Company, LLC v. Agridyne, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Slash F. Cattle Company, LLC
Represented By: Lynn D. Preheim
Represented By: Bailey McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agridyne, LLC doing business as Mix 30
Represented By: Scott E. Sanders
Represented By: Andrew Foulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plains States Commodities, LLC doing business as Mix 30
Represented By: Scott E. Sanders,
Represented By: Andrew Foulston
Represented By: Scott E. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?