Espinoza v. Norma
Plaintiff: Teresa Vargas Espinoza
Defendant: Rachel Norma
Case Number: 6:2023cv01256
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Brooks G Severson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint, addressed to Teresa Vargas Espinoza. (jal)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Dismissal re #1 Complaint filed by Teresa Vargas Espinoza (for failure to respond to #5 Order to Show Cause). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 1/17/24.Mailed to pro se party Teresa Vargas Espinoza by certified mail. (df)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #5 Memorandum & Order, addressed to Teresa Vargas Espinoza. (jal)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #6 Memorandum & Order addressed to Teresa Vargas Espinoza. (jal)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document #6 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel mailed to Teresa Vargas Espinoza on 12/5/2023 by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number 7020 0640 0001 1580 0651. (cc)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis,, mailed to Teresa Vargas Espinoza on 12/5/2023 by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number 7020 0640 0001 1580 0644. (cc)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 12/4/23. Mailed to pro se party Teresa Vargas Espinoza by certified mail. (df)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is instructed not to issue summons for service upon the Defendants at this time. This ORDER also serves as the ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE in writing why the undersigned Magistrate Judge should not recommend to the District Court that Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1) be DISMISSED or file an Amended Complaint to address the deficiencies enumerated herein. Plaintiff must do so within thirty (30) days of the receipt of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 12/4/23. Mailed to pro se party Teresa Vargas Espinoza by certified mail. (df)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Teresa Vargas Espinoza. (referred to Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson) (kmc)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Teresa Vargas Espinoza. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (referred to Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson) (Attachments: #1 Financial Affidavit)(kmc)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Teresa Vargas Espinoza. (kmc)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Wichita, filed by Teresa Vargas Espinoza. (kmc)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (kmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinoza v. Norma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Vargas Espinoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Norma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?