Morris v. Wyeth, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Morris
Defendant: Wyeth, Inc., Pliva, Inc., Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Morton Grove, Schwarz Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. and UDL Laboratories Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv00176
Filed: October 18, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Bowling Green Office
County: Taylor
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Russell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM OPINION by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 2/20/2009 re 96 MOTION for Reconsideration, filed by Dennis Morris. For the reasons stated, the Court finds that Plaintiff has failed to establish the exceptional circumstances necessary for the Court to reconsider its 10/24/2008 Order. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. An appropriate order shall issue. cc: Counsel (CDF)
October 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge Thomas B. Russell on 10/24/2008 re 60 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Federal Preemption filed by Pliva, Inc., 64 Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., UDL Laboratories Inc., 85 Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss filed by Morton Grove. For the foregoing reasons, the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. An appropriate order shall issue. cc: Counsel (CDF)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 92 OPINION AND ORDER denying 59 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment under Rule 54(b) signed by Judge Thomas B. Russell on 10/21/2008. cc: Counsel (LMW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Wyeth, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Morris
Represented By: P. Ann Trantham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pliva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morton Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwarz Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UDL Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?