Cervetto v. Powell et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael G. Cervetto |
Defendant: |
Mark J. Powell and Transervice Logistics Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00075 |
Filed: |
June 12, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky |
Office: |
Bowling Green Office |
County: |
Edmonson |
Presiding Judge: |
H. Brent Brennenstuhl |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph H. McKinley |
Nature of Suit: |
Motor Vehicle |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 16, 2016 |
Filing
128
Jury Instructions. (CDR)
|
November 4, 2016 |
Filing
122
MEMORANDUM, OPINION, AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/3/2016. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Cervetto's motion to deem Sherry Powell and Terry Lutz subject to compulsory attendance at trial through subpoena (DN 100 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion in limine (DN 114 ) to prohibit the use of the Transcript of the Recorded Statement is GRANTED. The Court may revisit this ruling during trial, however, should testimony warrant so doing. cc: Counsel (CDR)
|
June 9, 2016 |
Filing
93
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 86 Motion to Intervene filed by Great West Trucking, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 6/9/2016. cc: Counsel(CDR)
|
May 5, 2016 |
Filing
79
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 70 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to exclude evidence or testimony that Defendant suffered an unexpected blackout event. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 5/5/2016. cc: Counsel(CDR)
|
December 3, 2015 |
Filing
54
AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 12/2/2015; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion for summary judgment (DN 44 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendants' motion is GRANTED as to the issue of future economic damages but is DENIED as to the issues of causation and punitive damages. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (DN 48 ) is DENIED. (DN 53 amended) cc: Counsel (CDR)
|
December 1, 2015 |
Filing
53
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl regarding 44 48 Motions for Summary Judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion for summary judgment (DN 44 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendants' motion is GRANTED as to the issue of future economic damages and DENIED as to the issue of causation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (DN 48 ) is DENIED. cc: Counsel (CDR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?