Lyvers v. Newkirk et al
Plaintiff: |
Eric Todd Lyvers |
Defendant: |
James Newkirk, Wally Ritter, Jordan Jones, Tim Coleman and Sam Lowe |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00096 |
Filed: |
August 10, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky |
Office: |
Bowling Green Office |
County: |
Hart |
Presiding Judge: |
Greg N. Stivers |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 1, 2018 |
Filing
79
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 5/31/2018 denying 68 Motion to Compel (James Newkirk) and denying 69 Motion to Compel (Jordan Jones). cc: Eric Todd Lyvers, pro se; Counsel (CDF)
|
December 7, 2017 |
Filing
53
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Greg N. Stivers on 12/7/2017. Newkirk's Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment (DN 25 ) and Defendants Ritter and Jones' Combined Motion for Summary Judgment (DN 27 ) are DENIED. P laintiff's Motion to Supplement (DN 30 ), Plaintiff's Motion for Deposition by Phone (DN 32 ), Plaintiff's Motion for Deposition by Phone & Subpoena Duces Tecum (DN 35 ), Plaintiff's Supplement to Motion for Deposition by Te lephone (DN 36 ), Plaintiff's Motions for Extension of Time (DN 44 , 45 ), and Plaintiff's Motions to Reconsider (DN 46 , 49 ) and Defendant's Motion to Join (DN 52 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. Because the Court is denying Defendants' motions, discovery will proceed in this matter. The Court will enter a revised scheduling order resetting discovery and pretrial deadlines. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Counsel (CDR)
|
June 28, 2017 |
Filing
20
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Greg N. Stivers on 6/27/2017; IT IS ORDERED that all claims for injunctive relief, all claims against Defendant Lowe, the official-capacity claims against Defendants Deputies Ritter and Jones, and the individual- capacity claims related to the grand jury proceeding are DISMISSED. IT IS ORDERED that the official-capacity claims for damages against Defendants Officer Newkirk and Commonwealth's Attorney Coleman are DISMISSED. As all claims against Defendant s Lowe and Coleman have been dismissed, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate them from this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims of false arrest/imprisonment and unreasonable search and seizure shall continue against Defendants Officer Newkirk and Deputies Ritter and Jones in their individual capacity for damages. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Defendants; General Counsel, JPSC; Edmonson County Attorney (CDR)
|
January 28, 2016 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge Greg N. Stivers. Plaintiff having failed to file a notice of change of address, the Court concludes that he has abandoned any interest in prosecuting this case, and the Court will dismiss the action by separate Order. cc: Plaintiff, pro se (JLS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?