Smith et al v. T. Marzetti Company

Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Shelton and Larry Wayne Smith
Defendant: T. Marzetti Company
Intervenor Plaintiff: Great West Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00089
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Bowling Green Office
County: Hart
0 Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
1 Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2018 10 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/7/2018. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 10/1/2018. Supplementations shall be made within 30 days of first learning of the need to supplement, but no later than 30 days prior to the end of discovery. Joinder of Parties and Amended Pleadings due by 1/30/2019. Pretrial Fact Discovery due by 8/5/2019. Expert Witness (Plaintiff and Intervening Plaintiff) due by 4/26/2019. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 5/31/2019. Expert Discovery depositions due by 8/5/2019. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/12/2019 at 9:00 AM CT before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. Dispositive Motions and Daubert Motions due by 9/3/2019. (Review Order in full for specifics, including discovery guidelines.) cc: Counsel (CDF)
August 20, 2018 9 Agreed REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Great West Casualty Company, T. Marzetti Company. (Hickey, Stockard)
August 9, 2018 8 Featured Case TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 8/9/2018. Upon request of counsel for Defendant; IT IS ORDERED the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2018 is RESCHEDULED to be conducted on 9/7/2018 at 9:30 AM, CDT, before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. The Court will initiate the call. All other provisions of the order entered at DN 6 shall remain in full force and effect. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (KLL)
August 3, 2018 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic General Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corporation for Great West Casualty Company. by Great West Casualty Company. (Hickey, Stockard)
July 19, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 7/18/2018; Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2018 at 10:00 AM CT before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. Parties shall conduct meeting required by Rule 26(f) by 8/10/2018 and file their Rule 26 Meeting Report by 8/24/2018. (Review Order in full for specifics, including conference agenda and report requirements.) cc: Counsel; KL (CDF)
July 18, 2018 5 Featured Case TEXT ORDER by Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 07/18/2018; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; KLL (TJD)
July 13, 2018 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Hart Circuit Court Civil Action 18-CI-109. cc: Counsel; Hart Circuit Court (JWM)
July 13, 2018 ANSWER to Intervening Complaint by T. Marzetti Company (See DN #1 to view PDF). (JWM)
July 13, 2018 ANSWER to Complaint by T. Marzetti Company (Seen DN #1 to view PDF). (JWM)
July 13, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Lancaster Colony Corporation for T. Marzetti Company. (JWM)
July 13, 2018 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
July 13, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by T. Marzetti Company from Hart Circuit Court, Case Number 18-CI-00109. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2676512 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B-July 11, 2018 Email from Schultz, #3 Exhibit C-Legal Disclosures, #4 Certificate of Filing, #5 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Cover Sheet) (JWM) Modified to edit filer on 7/13/2018 (JWM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. T. Marzetti Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Shelton
Represented By: Matthew P. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Smith
Represented By: Matthew P. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Great West Casualty Company
Represented By: Stockard R. Hickey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Marzetti Company
Represented By: Stockard R. Hickey, III
Represented By: Justin M. Schaefer
Represented By: Michael S. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?