Powell v. Shelton et al

Plaintiff: Valerie Powell
Defendant: Mackie Shelton and Barry Dyer
Case Number: 1:2018cv00128
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(7) filed by Valerie Powell. (Lowder, Thomas)
October 8, 2018 7 DUPLICATE FILING. See DN #6 to view correct PDF (CDF).
October 8, 2018 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(7) by Defendant Mackie Shelton, Barry Dyer (Moore, Frank) Modified motion event and added filer on 10/9/2018 (CDF). Modified to add filer on 10/9/2018 (CDF).
October 3, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valerie Powell. Barry Dyer served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Lowder, Thomas)
October 3, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valerie Powell. Mackie Shelton served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Lowder, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 3 Summonses Issued as to Barry Dyer, Mackie Shelton. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued) (JWM)
September 12, 2018 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
September 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Mackie Shelton and Barry Dyer, filed by Valerie Powell. Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2714931. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Barry Dyer) (JWM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2018: #3 Summons Mackie Shelton) (JWM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Shelton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mackie Shelton
Represented By: Frank Hampton Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Frank Hampton Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Dyer
Represented By: Frank Hampton Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Frank Hampton Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Powell
Represented By: Thomas B. Lowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?