Graham v. Plastics Engineering Company et al
Plaintiff: David H. Graham
Defendant: General Electric Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc., Cytec Engineered Materials, Inc., Plastics Engineering Company and Union Carbide Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv00134
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff, David Graham by David H. Graham. (Kelley, Paul)
October 26, 2018 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Occidental Chemical Holding Corporation, Occidental Petroleum Investment Co., Occidental Petroleum Corporation as Corporate Parents by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Schupbach, Rebecca) Modified to add corporate parents on 10/29/2018 (JWM).
October 26, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Schupbach, Rebecca)
October 22, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Soco West, Inc., Corporate Parent Brilliant National Services, Inc. for Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.. by Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.. (Watt, Whitney)
October 22, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.. (Watt, Whitney)
October 19, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plastics Engineering Company. (Bentley, Frederick)
October 19, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Plastics Engineering Company. (Bentley, Frederick)
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Plastics Engineering Company COMPLETED on 9/26/2018. Secretary of State return states We are enclosing the return receipt confirming receipt of summons.. (DAK)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. COMPLETED on 9/26/2018. Secretary of State return states We are enclosing the return receipt confirming receipt of summons.. (DAK)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Gowen, Gregory)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by General Electric Company. (Gowen, Gregory)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company and DowDuPont Inc. for Union Carbide Corporation. by Union Carbide Corporation. (Rowlen, Brantley) Modified to add corporate parent on 10/5/2018 (CDF).
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Union Carbide Corporation. (Rowlen, Brantley)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brantley C. Rowlen, R. Scott Masterson, V. Ashley Waller on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Rowlen, Brantley) Modified to add additional attorneys on 10/3/2018 (CDF).
September 21, 2018 Remark-Attested copy of complaint emailed to Attorney Paul Kelley 9/21/2018 per request. (JWM)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Cytec Engineered Materials, Inc., General Electric Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Plastics Engineering Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Plastics Engineering Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Cytec Engineered Materials, Inc., Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, and General Electric Company, filed by David H. Graham. Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2721382. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Plastics Engineering Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Scott T. Dickens
Represented By: Gregory Scott Gowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Rebecca F. Schupbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Represented By: Whitney Frazier Watt
Represented By: Carolyn Y. Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cytec Engineered Materials, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plastics Engineering Company
Represented By: Frederick R. Bentley, III
Represented By: Matthew W. Breetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Brantley C. Rowlen
Represented By: Victoria A. Waller
Represented By: R. Scott Masterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David H. Graham
Represented By: Paul J. Ivie
Represented By: Gary S. Logsdon
Represented By: Joseph D. Satterley
Represented By: Paul J. Kelley
Represented By: James E. Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?