United States of America v. Taylor et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Dawn Taylor and Kenneth Taylor
Undetermined: Warning Order Attorney
Case Number: 1:2018cv00145
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WARNING ORDER AND ORDER APPOINTING WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/26/2018 granting #7 Warning Order. Attorney Kevin L. Goff for Warning Order Attorney appointed. cc: Counsel; Defendants (CDF)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment for Dawn Taylor by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Issuance, #2 Proposed Order) (Campbell, William)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Kenneth Taylor served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (Campbell, William)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 10/11/2018; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; KLL (TJD)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Dawn Taylor, Kenneth Taylor. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (CDF)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against Kenneth Taylor, Dawn Taylor, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Real Estate Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Cover Sheet) (CDF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Represented By: Katherine A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Warning Order Attorney
Represented By: Kevin L. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?