Owens et al v. Trulock et al
Plaintiff: Sheila Bryant and Anthony Owens
Defendant: Larry Dale Martin, II, Randall Curry, Chris Trulock, Sean Henry, City of Horse Cave, Kentucky and Horse Cave Police Department
Case Number: 1:2018cv00167
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441fa
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 1/3/2019. Upon request of counsel for Defendants; IT IS ORDERED the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2019 is RESCHEDULED to be conducted on 2/4/2019 at 9:30 AM, CST, before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. The Court will initiate the call. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (KLL)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by City of Horse Cave, Kentucky, Randall Curry, Sean Henry, Horse Cave Police Department, Larry Dale Martin, II, Chris Trulock. (Bell, Jason)
December 31, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sean Henry, Chris Trulock. (Petitt, Carol)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol S. Petitt and Falin M. McKenzie on behalf of Sean Henry, Chris Trulock (Petitt, Carol) Modified to add attorney Falin M. McKenzie on 12/20/2018 (CDF).
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 12/18/2018; Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2019 at 10:00 AM CT before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. Parties shall conduct meeting required by Rule 26(f) by 1/8/2019 and file their Rule 26 Meeting Report by 1/22/2019. (Review Order in full for specifics, including report requirements.) cc: Counsel; KL (CDF)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 12/18/2018; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; KLL (TJD)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Horse Cave, Kentucky, Randall Curry, Horse Cave Police Department. (Cook, Matthew) Modified to add Jury Demand on 12/17/2018 (CDF).
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Larry Dale Martin, II. (Bell, Jason)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL re #1 Notice of Removal from Hart Circuit Court, 18-CI-00221. cc: Counsel, Hart Circuit Court (JWM)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chris Trulock, Larry Dale Martin, II, Sean Henry, Horse Cave Police Department, and City of Horse Cave, Kentucky from Hart Circuit Court, Case Number 18-CI-00221. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2755905 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pleadings) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens et al v. Trulock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Dale Martin, II
Represented By: Jason B. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Curry
Represented By: Matthew Porter Cook
Represented By: Thomas N. Kerrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Trulock
Represented By: Jason B. Bell
Represented By: Carol S. Petitt
Represented By: Falin M. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Henry
Represented By: Jason B. Bell
Represented By: Carol S. Petitt
Represented By: Falin M. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Horse Cave, Kentucky
Represented By: Matthew Porter Cook
Represented By: Thomas N. Kerrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horse Cave Police Department
Represented By: Matthew Porter Cook
Represented By: Thomas N. Kerrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Bryant
Represented By: Johnny Bell
Represented By: Adrian Martin Mendiondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Owens
Represented By: Johnny Bell
Represented By: Adrian Martin Mendiondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?