Bluegrass Materials Company, LLC v. Freeman et al
Plaintiff: Bluegrass Materials Company, LLC
Defendant: Laura A. Schoonover, James M. Freeman, David B. Bradshaw, Ralph D. Wareham, Black Gold Oil Co., Frank W. Freeman, C&L Farms, A Partnership, Unknown Heirs of David B. Bradshaw and Unknown Heirs of Ralph D. Wareham
Undetermined: Warning Order Attorney
Case Number: 1:2018cv00177
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332rp
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 WARNING ORDER AND ORDER APPOINTING WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 1/29/2019. The Court having granted the discharge of Warning Order Attorney Keith M. Carwell due to a conflict of interest: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a new Warning Order Attorney is appointed to this matter. Attorney Larry Floyd Hinton is appointed as Warning Order Attorney for the following defendants: Ralph D. Wareham, Unknown Heirs of Ralph D. Wareham, David B. Bradshaw, and Unknown Heirs of David B. Bradshaw. (See Order for specifics.) cc: Counsel (CDF)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISCHARGING KEITH M. CARWELL AS WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 1/28/2019 granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Warning Order Attorney. cc: Counsel (CDF)
January 18, 2019 Filing 17 DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF EXCHANGE OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS by Black Gold Oil Co., C&L Farms, A Partnership, Frank W. Freeman, James M. Freeman, Laura A. Schoonover. (Meredith, Kenneth) Modified text on 1/22/2019 (CDF).
January 10, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Black Gold Oil Co., C&L Farms, A Partnership, Frank W. Freeman, James M. Freeman, Laura A. Schoonover. (Meredith, Kenneth)
January 10, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Black Gold Oil Co., C&L Farms, A Partnership, Frank W. Freeman, James M. Freeman, Laura A. Schoonover. (Meredith, Kenneth)
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bluegrass Materials Company, LLC. James M. Freeman served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service) (Oakley, Kenneth)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Warning Order Attorney by Miscellaneous Warning Order Attorney (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order discharging Keith M. Carwell as Warning Order Attorney) (Carwell, Keith) Modified event and text on 1/4/2019 (CDF).
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bluegrass Materials Company, LLC. Black Gold Oil Co. served on 12/22/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service) (Oakley, Kenneth)
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bluegrass Materials Company, LLC. Laura A. Schoonover served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Service) (Oakley, Kenneth)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bluegrass Materials Company, LLC. C&L Farms, A Partnership served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Service) (Oakley, Kenneth)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bluegrass Materials Company, LLC. Frank W. Freeman served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Service) (Oakley, Kenneth)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WARNING ORDER AND ORDER APPOINTING WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 12/19/2018 granting #5 Warning Order. Attorney Keith M. Carwell for Warning Order Attorney appointed. cc: Counsel; Defendants (CDF)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of email confirmation as to Kenneth Oakley re #6 Request for Fee Refund (MLG)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Fee Refund re #1 Complaint,,, by Bluegrass Materials Company, LLC. (Oakley, Kenneth)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment by Plaintiff Bluegrass Materials Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit in Support of Mtn for Warning Order Attorney, #2 Proposed Order) (Oakley, Kenneth)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. for Bluegrass Materials Company, LLC. by Bluegrass Materials Company, LLC. (Oakley, Kenneth)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Black Gold Oil Co., David B. Bradshaw, C&L Farms, A Partnership, Frank W. Freeman, James M. Freeman, Laura A. Schoonover, Unknown Heirs of David B. Bradshaw, Unknown Heirs of Ralph D. Wareham, Ralph D. Wareham. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATION OF RIGHTS, DAMAGES, AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Frank W. Freeman, James M. Freeman, Laura A. Schoonover, Black Gold Oil Co., C&L Farms, A Partnership, David B. Bradshaw, Unknown Heirs of David B. Bradshaw, Ralph D. Wareham, Unknown Heirs of Ralph D. Wareham, filed by Bluegrass Materials Company, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2769056. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Special Warranty Deed, #2 Exhibit B-Manning Lease, #3 Exhibit C-Assignment-Black Gold to Freeman, #4 Exhibit D-Assignment Black Gold to Bradshaw, #5 Exhibit E-Assignment-Black Gold to Freeman, #6 Exhibit F-Assignment-Bradshaw to C&L Farms, #7 Exhibit G-Assignment-Wareham to C&L Farms, #8 Exhibit H-12.03.18 Warren Co KY Intent to Drill Oil Letter, #9 Exhibit I-4.12.17 Demand Letter, #10 Summons, #11 Cover Sheet) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bluegrass Materials Company, LLC v. Freeman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura A. Schoonover
Represented By: Kenneth A. Meredith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Freeman
Represented By: Kenneth A. Meredith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph D. Wareham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Gold Oil Co.
Represented By: Kenneth A. Meredith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank W. Freeman
Represented By: Kenneth A. Meredith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&L Farms, A Partnership
Represented By: Kenneth A. Meredith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs of David B. Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs of Ralph D. Wareham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bluegrass Materials Company, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Elmore
Represented By: Kenneth B. Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Warning Order Attorney
Represented By: Keith M. Carwell
Represented By: Larry Floyd Hinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?