Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America v. JSJ Express, LLC

Plaintiff: Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America
Defendant: JSJ Express, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00179
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 49:14706
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 Alias Summons Issued as to JSJ Express, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (CDF)
February 5, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 MOTION request to issue alias summons ; Error: Incorrect docketing event selected. Document is not a motion. The more appropriate event would have been the "Notice (Other)" event.; Correction: Motion event and associated deadlines terminated. Docket text edited to reflect "NOTICE of Request for Alias Summons." (CDF)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Request to Issue Alias Summons by Plaintiff Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 proposed summons) (Chapman, Michael) Modified event text on 2/5/2019 (CDF).
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 12/21/2018 granting #7 Motion for Leave to File a Redacted Version of Exhibit G (DN #1 -7). The redacted version of Exhibit G shall replace the originally submitted Exhibit G. cc: Counsel; Defendant (CDF)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Redacted Version of Complaint Exhibit G (Doc. #1 - 7) by Plaintiff Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REDACTED exhibit G (to replace 01-7), #2 Proposed Order proposed order granting leave to replace unredacted exhibit) (Chapman, Michael) Modified to add link on 12/21/2018 (CDF).
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co. Ltd., Corporate Parent MS&AD Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent MSIG Holdings (Americas), Inc., Corporate Parent Aioi Nissay Dowa Insurance Company, Limited for Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America. by Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America. (Chapman, Michael) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (CDF).
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 12/19/2018. Plaintiff filed a document (DN #1 -7) which contains the following personal data identifier(s): FINANCIAL ACCOUNT NUMBERS (Only the last four numbers of the account number may be identified). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, the personal data identifier(s) must be redacted. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to RESTRICT electronic access to this document (DN #1 -7) to Court users and participants in the case. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a motion seeking leave to file a redacted version of the document along with a copy of the redacted version within 7 days of the entry date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that when Plaintiff files a motion seeking leave to file a redacted version of the document, the motion will be GRANTED, and the Clerk will replace the document containing personal identifiers with the redacted version. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record (TJD)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., LTD, Corporate Parent MS&AD Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America. by Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America. (JWM)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JSJ Express, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JSJ Express, LLC, filed by Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America. Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2771120. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Bill of Lading, #2 Exhibit B-Photo of Damaged Cargo, #3 Exhibit C-Invoice of Costs, #4 Exhibit D-Proof of Loss, #5 Exhibit E-Mitsui Payment, #6 Exhibit F-Subrogation Receipt, #7 Exhibit G-Salvage Check, #8 Exhibit H-Claim Denial, #9 Exhibit I-Denso Loading Instructions, #10 Cover Sheet, #11 Summons) (JWM) (Attachment 7 replaced on 12/21/2018) (CDF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America v. JSJ Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSJ Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Michael J. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?