Basham v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Patty L. Basham
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00019
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patty L. Basham as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Burchett-Bower, Mary)
February 14, 2019 Remark-Attested copy of Complaint emailed to attorney Mary Burchett-Bower on 2/14/2019 per request. (JWM)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 3/7/2019. (JWM)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lanny King. (JWM)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Patty L. Basham.Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2804108. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basham v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty L. Basham
Represented By: Mary G. Burchett-Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?