Westfield Insurance Company v. Harrington et al

Plaintiff: Westfield Insurance Company
Defendant: Amy L. Harrington, Paul Dennison and Dennison's Roadside Market
Case Number: 1:2019cv00037
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AGREED ORDER PERMITTING LATE FILED ANSWER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 5/28/2019 re #19 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Dennison's Roadside Market, Paul Dennison. cc: Counsel (CDF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint DN #5 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Paul Dennison, Dennison's Roadside Market. (Alexander, Thomas) Modified to add docket entry relationships on 5/23/2019 (JWM).
May 22, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Paul Dennison, Dennison's Roadside Market. (Alexander, Thomas)
May 14, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Westfield's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed by Amy L. Harrington. (Morris, Christopher)
May 7, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Westfield's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter to Westfield Insurance, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Response and Objection to Intervenor's Motion to Intervene) (Bass, Elizabeth)
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Westfield's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Defendant Amy L. Harrington (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hart Circuit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Hart Circuit Answers & Cross-Claim, #3 Exhibit Hart Circuit Motion to Intervene, #4 Exhibit Hart Circuit Order, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Morris, Christopher)
April 18, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westfield Insurance Company. Dennison's Roadside Market served on 4/13/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Bass, Elizabeth)
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westfield Insurance Company. Paul Dennison served on 4/13/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Bass, Elizabeth)
April 11, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westfield Insurance Company. Amy L. Harrington served on 3/30/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 (See DN #11 to view PDF). (JWM)
April 11, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westfield Insurance Company. Dennison's Roadside Market served on 3/30/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 (See DN #10 to view PDF) (JWM)
April 11, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed Paul Dennison served on 3/30/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 (See DN #9 to view PDF). (JWM)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION Re:PDF Error: INCORRECT document attached to docket entry by efiler re: #11 Return of Service ; Correct document attached to this entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit Signed Certificate Receipt) (Bass, Elizabeth)
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Amy L. Harrington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Certified Receipt) (Bass, Elizabeth) Modified to edit event text on 4/12/2019 (JWM).
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dennison's Roadside Market. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Certified Receipt) (Bass, Elizabeth) Modified to edit event text on 4/12/2019 (JWM).
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Paul B. Dennison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Certified Receipt) (Bass, Elizabeth) Modified to edit event text on 4/12/2019 (JWM).
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 Summonses Issued on #5 Amended Complaint as to Paul Dennison, Dennison's Roadside Market, Amy L. Harrington. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (CDF)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Westfield Insurance Company. Amendment to #6 Notice of filing tendered summonses by Westfield Insurance Company. (Bass, Elizabeth) Modified text on 4/2/2019 (CDF).
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing tendered summonses by Westfield Insurance Company re #5 Amended Complaint, (Bass, Elizabeth) Modified to add text on 4/2/2019 (CDF).
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Amy L. Harrington, Dennison's Roadside Market, Paul Dennison, filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy) (Bass, Elizabeth) (Main Document 5 replaced with case number added on 3/29/2019) (CDF). Modified text as to defendants on 3/29/2019 (CDF).
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Westfield Insurance Company. (Bass, Elizabeth)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Paul Dennison, Dennison's Roadside Market, Amy L. Harrington. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Amy L. Harrington, Dennison's Roadside Market, Paul Dennison filed by Westfield Insurance Company. Filing Fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2834223. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Insurance Policy, #3 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westfield Insurance Company v. Harrington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westfield Insurance Company
Represented By: John William Walters
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy L. Harrington
Represented By: Christopher H. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Dennison
Represented By: Thomas R. Alexander, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennison's Roadside Market
Represented By: Thomas R. Alexander, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?