Rannells v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ronald M. Rannells
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00056
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ronald M. Rannells (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Burchett, Charles)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 5/30/2019 denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may submit a new application if he so chooses. Failure to file the indicated IFP application or pay the filing fee, whichever the case may be, within 30 days of entry of this Order may result in dismissal of Plaintiff's complaint by way of further order of the Court. cc: Counsel (CDF)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lanny King. (JWM)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ronald M. Rannells (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (JWM)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Ronald M. Rannells. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Regarding Filing Date, #3 Summons, #4 USM 285) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rannells v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: L. Jay Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald M. Rannells
Represented By: Charles Richard Burchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?