Babbs v. Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC
Plaintiff: Dennis Babbs
Defendant: Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00064
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC re #6 PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #13 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Combs, Tia)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 07/03/2019.The Defendant filed a document (DN 13-1) which contains the following personal data identifier: SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBERS (Only the last four numbers may be identified). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, the personal data identifier must be redacted. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to SEAL DN 13-1. IT IS ORDERED that within 7 days of the entry date of this Order the Defendant shall either file a motion to seal the document or shall file a redacted version of the document that includes a cover page entitled Notice of Filing and links this document to the originally filed document. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record (TJD)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC. (Stansbury, Casey)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit A by Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC re #6 PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Combs, Tia) Modified to add text on 7/2/2019 (CDF).
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dennis Babbs. (Larson, Tyler)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 6/4/2019 granting #9 Motion for R. Christopher White to Appear Pro Hac Vice cc: Counsel; Christopher White; Scott Pedigo(JWM)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 6/4/2019 granting #8 Motion for Scott W. Pedigo to Appear Pro Hac Vice cc: Counsel; Scott Pedigo; Christopher White(JWM)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Robert Christopher White to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2875901. by Defendant Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 ECF Registration) (Combs, Tia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2019: #3 Proposed Order) (JWM).
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Scott W. Pedigo to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2875889. by Defendant Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 ECF Registration) (Combs, Tia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2019: #3 Proposed Order) (JWM).
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Order re #6 PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC. (Stansbury, Casey)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Stansbury, Casey) Modified to add "Partial" on 5/30/2019 (CDF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2019: #2 Proposed Order) (CDF).
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Tyson Foods, Inc. for Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC. by Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC. (Stansbury, Casey)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC. (Stansbury, Casey)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE to Warren Circuit Court and counsel, re #1 Notice of Removal. (CDF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Warren Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00383, filed by Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2870552) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Declaration re Amount in Controversy, #2 State Court Docket, #3 State Court Record, #4 Cover Sheet) (CDF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Babbs v. Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC
Represented By: Tia J. Combs
Represented By: R. Christopher White
Represented By: Scott W. Pedigo
Represented By: Casey C. Stansbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Babbs
Represented By: Tyler A. Larson
Represented By: James Robert Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?