CWI, Inc. v. Navico, Inc.

Plaintiff: CWI, Inc.
Defendant: Navico, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00067
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 7/16/2019 granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Richard P. Darke. cc: Counsel (CDF)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT re #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CWI, Inc.. (Bumgarner, Kyle)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by CWI, Inc.. (Bumgarner, Kyle)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Richard P. Darke to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2902208. by Plaintiff CWI, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Bumgarner, Kyle)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Plaintiff CWI, Inc., Counter Defendant CWI, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time) (Bumgarner, Kyle)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing of Additional Copy of Answer and Counterclaim (with exhibits) by Navico, Inc. re #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer and Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Purchase Orders, #4 Exhibit 3 - Statement of Account) (Ames, E.)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 6/21/2019; Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 11:00 AM CT before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. Parties shall conduct meeting required by Rule 26(f) by 7/17/2019 and file their Rule 26 Meeting Report by 7/31/2019. (Review Order in full for specifics, including conference agenda and report requirements.) cc: Counsel; KL (CDF)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 06/21/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Navico Holding AS for Navico, Inc.. by Navico, Inc.. (Ames, E.)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against CWI, Inc. by Navico, Inc.. (Ames, E.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2019: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Purchase Orders, #3 Exhibit 3 - Statement of Account) (CDF).
May 23, 2019 Remark-Attested copy of complaint emailed to attorney Kyle Bumgarner 5/23/2019 (JWM)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Navico, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Camping World Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent CWGS Enterprises, LLC for CWI, Inc.. by CWI, Inc.. (JWM)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND PROMISSORY ESTOPPEL against Navico, Inc., filed by CWI, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2871296. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-New Store Contribution Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-Ventor Terms and Conditions Agreement, #3 Exhibit C-Vendor Participation Agreement, #4 Exhibit D-Ventor Information Form, #5 Exhibit E-Lowrance Fishfinder or Locator, #6 Exhibit F-Email and Invoice dated 8/15/18, #7 Exhibit G-Email and Invoice dated 10/19/18, #8 Summons) (JWM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2019: #9 Cover Sheet) (JWM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CWI, Inc. v. Navico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navico, Inc.
Represented By: Charles E. English, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph C. Wylie, II
Represented By: E. Kenly Ames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CWI, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle G. Bumgarner
Represented By: Richard P. Darke
Represented By: John T. Schriver
Represented By: Scott A. Bachert
Represented By: Keith M. St. Aubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?