Page v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Travis S. Page
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00093
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers no longer assigned to case. (JWM)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 8/8/2019. This case is reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Lanny King for all purposes, including trial and final entry of judgment.cc:counsel; Case Manager-Magistrate Judge King (JWM)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge (JWM)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 CASE REASSIGNED to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers pursuant to General Order No. 2018-02.(cc: counsel, Chief Judge Stivers CM) (MHB)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travis S. Page as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Burchett-Bower, Mary)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 8/5/2019. (JWM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lanny King. (JWM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Travis S. Page. Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2903207. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Page v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: L. Jay Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis S. Page
Represented By: Mary G. Burchett-Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?