Carver v. Houchens Food Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Roy Anderson Carver, Jr.
Defendant: Charles Black, N. Miley, Houchens Food Group, Inc. and Commonwealth of Kentucky Cabinet for Unemployment Insurance
Case Number: 1:2019cv00099
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 Pro Se (Non Prisoner) Registration to Receive Documents Electronically by Roy Anderson Carver, Jr. (Attachments: #1 cover letter & envelope) (CDF)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Roy Anderson Carver, Jr. to P.O. Box 51347, Bowling Green, KY 42102. (CDF)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #4 Notice (Other) by Roy Anderson Carver, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Summons) (DJT)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 8/1/2019 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Plaintiff, pro se (CDF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. (CDF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Roy Anderson Carver, Jr. (CDF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS against Houchens Food Group, Inc. (Human Resources), Houchens Food Group, Inc. (D.C. Operations), Commonwealth of Kentucky Cabinet for Unemployment Insurance, Charles Black, N. Miley, filed by Roy Anderson Carver, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 originally signed copy of Complaint with cover sheet) (CDF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2019: #3 Summons) (DJT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carver v. Houchens Food Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Miley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houchens Food Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Kentucky Cabinet for Unemployment Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Anderson Carver, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?