N. Harris Computer Corporation et al v. DSI Investments, LLC et al
Plaintiff: N. Harris Computer Corporation, Colossus, Inc. and InterAct911 Corporation
Defendant: David C. Ogles, Digitech Services, Inc., DSI Investments, LLC and E-Jail, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00142
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER (EBOC) by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 11/14/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2019 at 01:30 p.m. CST before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. The Court will initiate the call. No later than November 29, 2019, counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f). No later than December 13, 2019, counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report outlining the proposed discovery plan. cc: Counsel of Record, Kelly Lovell (KD)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 11/14/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
November 13, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint,, #1 Complaint,,, , ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint,, #1 Complaint,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Colossus, Inc., N. Harris Computer Corporation by Digitech Services, Inc., E-Jail, LLC, DSI Investments, LLC, David C. Ogles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email re Reimbursement Agreement) (Ames, E.)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 11/12/2019. Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (DN #5 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (DN #14 ) is GRANTED. Defendants DSI Investments, LLC, Digitech Services, Inc., David C. Ogles, and E-Jail, LLC, and all those acting in concert with them are ENJOINED and RESTRAINED from violating the terms of the 2012 Agreement. Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery (DN #15 ) and Defendants' Cross Motion to Expedite Discovery (DN #20 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Declaration of Andrew Wright (DN #22 ) is GRANTED. cc: Counsel(JWM)
October 29, 2019 Remark: Hearing on pending motions held on 10/29/19. Appearing for the Plaintiffs was Chad E Wallace. Appearing for the Defendants was E. Kenly Ames. The proceedings were digitally recorded via Court ECRO Jessica Mercer. (TJD)
October 29, 2019 Filing 24 EXHIBIT INVENTORY by ECRO-Jessie Mercer for Hearing on Motions held 10/29/2019. (JWM)
October 29, 2019 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by N. Harris Computer Corporation, Colossus, Inc., InterAct911 Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit United States Copyright No. TX0006352824, #2 Exhibit Assignment of Intellectual Property, #3 Exhibit 2012 Confidentiality Agreement, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Wright, #5 Exhibit Colossus Lease Agreement, #6 Exhibit Harris Lease Agreement, #7 Exhibit April 15, 2019 Default Letter, #8 Exhibit July 2, 2019 Demand Letter, #9 Exhibit June 18, 2019 E-mail, #10 Exhibit Declaration of Dalton Jones) (Wallace, Chad)
October 28, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Withdraw Declaration of Andrew Wright by Plaintiffs Colossus, Inc., InterAct911 Corporation, N. Harris Computer Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wallace, Chad)
October 28, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Colossus, Inc., InterAct911 Corporation, N. Harris Computer Corporation. (Wallace, Chad)
October 24, 2019 Filing 20 Cross MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Defendants DSI Investments, LLC, Digitech Services, Inc., E-Jail, LLC, David C. Ogles (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Proposed Expedited Discovery Requests, #2 Proposed Order) (Ames, E.)
October 24, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Brief in Support filed by DSI Investments, LLC, Digitech Services, Inc., E-Jail, LLC, David C. Ogles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Proposed Expedited Discovery Requests) (Ames, E.)
October 24, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by DSI Investments, LLC, Digitech Services, Inc., E-Jail, LLC, David C. Ogles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David C. Ogles, #2 Ogles Decl., Ex. A - Asset Purchase Agreement Exceprts, #3 Ogles Decl., Ex. B - Employment Agreement, #4 Ogles Decl., Ex C - Skype Chat with Developer, #5 Ogles Decl., Ex. D - Code Repository Log, #6 Ogles Decl., Ex. E - Software Listing) (Ames, E.)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DSI Investments, LLC, Digitech Services, Inc., E-Jail, LLC. (Ames, E.)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers for telephonic conference held 10/17/2019. A hearing on the pending motions is set on 10/29/2019 at 9:00 am CDT. (Court Reporter ECRO-Jessie Mercer.) cc:counsel (JWM)
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Brief in Support by Plaintiffs Colossus, Inc., InterAct911 Corporation, N. Harris Computer Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Wright, #2 Exhibit Proposed Expedited Interrogatories to Defendant David Ogles, #3 Exhibit Proposed Expedited Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant David Ogles, #4 Exhibit Proposed Notice of Deposition of David Ogles, #5 Exhibit Proposed Subpoena to Third-Party Jamie Mosley, #6 Exhibit Proposed Subpoena to Third-Party Brent Deweese, #7 Proposed Order) (Wallace, Chad)
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Colossus, Inc., InterAct911 Corporation, N. Harris Computer Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Preliminary Injunction) (Wallace, Chad)
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Kenly Ames on behalf of DSI Investments, LLC, Digitech Services, Inc., E-Jail, LLC, David C. Ogles (Ames, E.)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by N. Harris Computer Corporation, Colossus, Inc., InterAct911 Corporation. E-Jail, LLC served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (Wallace, Chad)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by N. Harris Computer Corporation, Colossus, Inc., InterAct911 Corporation. David C. Ogles served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (Wallace, Chad)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by N. Harris Computer Corporation, Colossus, Inc., InterAct911 Corporation. Digitech Services, Inc. served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (Wallace, Chad)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by N. Harris Computer Corporation, Colossus, Inc., InterAct911 Corporation. DSI Investments, LLC served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (Wallace, Chad)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent N. Harris Computer Corporation, Corporate Parent Trapeze Software Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Trapeze Software ULC, Corporate Parent Constellation Software, Inc., Corporate Parent Canadian Software Investment Fund Inc., Corporate Parent Volaris Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Constellation Homebuilder Systems, Corporation, Corporate Parent Volaris Group Inc. for InterAct911 Corporation. by InterAct911 Corporation. (Wallace, Chad)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent N. Harris Computer Corporation, Corporate Parent InterAct911 Corporation, Corporate Parent Trapeze Software Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Trapeze Software ULC, Corporate Parent Constellation Software, Inc., Corporate Parent Canadian Software Investment Fund Inc., Corporate Parent Volaris Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Constellation Homebuilder Systems, Corporation, Corporate Parent Volaris Group Inc. for Colossus, Inc.. by Colossus, Inc.. (Wallace, Chad)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Constellation Software Inc. for N. Harris Computer Corporation. by N. Harris Computer Corporation. (Wallace, Chad)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Colossus, Inc., InterAct911 Corporation, N. Harris Computer Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of filing to Defendant's attorney, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Order) (Wallace, Chad)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright re #1 Complaint. (CDF)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to DSI Investments, LLC, Digitech Services, Inc., E-Jail, LLC, David C. Ogles. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (CDF)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DSI Investments, LLC, Digitech Services, Inc., David C. Ogles, E-Jail, LLC, filed by N. Harris Computer Corporation, Colossus, Inc., InterAct911 Corporation. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2958215.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Copyright Reg. No. TX0006352824, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment of Intellectual Property, #3 Exhibit C - 2012 Confidentiality Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Andrew Wright, #5 Exhibit E - 2018 Proprietary Rights Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Colossus Lease, #7 Exhibit G - Harris Lease, #8 Exhibit H - April 15, 2019 Default Letter, #9 Exhibit I - July 2, 2019 Demand Letter, #10 Exhibit J - June 18, 2019 E-Mail from David Ogles, #11 Exhibit K - Declaration of Dalton Jones, #12 Cover Sheet) (CDF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N. Harris Computer Corporation et al v. DSI Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Ogles
Represented By: E. Kenly Ames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digitech Services, Inc.
Represented By: E. Kenly Ames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSI Investments, LLC
Represented By: E. Kenly Ames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-Jail, LLC
Represented By: E. Kenly Ames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. Harris Computer Corporation
Represented By: Chad E. Wallace
Represented By: Chelsa N. Hayes
Represented By: Chelsea N. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colossus, Inc.
Represented By: Chad E. Wallace
Represented By: Chelsa N. Hayes
Represented By: Chelsea N. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InterAct911 Corporation
Represented By: Chad E. Wallace
Represented By: Chelsa N. Hayes
Represented By: Chelsea N. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?