Thomas v. Barnhardt et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Dalton Thomas
Defendant: EEOC AJ Aarika Mack-Brown, KY Personnel Board, Energy & Environment Cabinet KY Div. of Forestry and David L. Barnhardt
Case Number: 1:2019cv00157
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Set Aside Judgement in Aug. 8 EEOC Ruling in Case #470-2019-00060x by Plaintiff Christopher Dalton Thomas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (CDF)
December 26, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher Dalton Thomas re #13 MOTION to Clarify(Potential Settlement) (CDF)
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Clarify(Potential Settlement) by Plaintiff Christopher Dalton Thomas, pro se (Attachments: #1 Miscellaeneous Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (JWM)
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 Receipt of Non-Electronic Document (CD) re #11 MOTION for Leave to Admit Evidentiary Hearing in Case # 2013-291 with KY Personnel Board, filed by Christopher Dalton Thomas. (CDF)
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Admit Evidentiary Hearing in Case #2013-291 with KY Personnel Board, by Plaintiff Christopher Dalton Thomas. (CDF)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 11/15/2019 re #4 Motion for Legal Assistance, which the Court construes as a motion for appointment of counsel. IT IS ORDERED that the motion for appointment of counsel (DN #4 ) is DENIED. cc: Plaintiff, pro se (via electronic noticing - per DN #7 ) (CDF)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 11/14/2019 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Plaintiff, pro se (via electronic noticing - per DN #7 ) (CDF)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit (Doctor's note) by Christopher Dalton Thomas re #5 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint. (CDF)
November 13, 2019 Remark: Plaintiff will now receive all court documents electronically. (MLG)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 PRO SE (Non Prisoner) REGISTRATION to Receive Documents Electronically by Christopher Dalton Thomas (CDF)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing tendered (incomplete) summons forms by Christopher Dalton Thomas re #5 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint. (CDF)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Employment Discrimination against David L. Barnhardt, Energy & Environment Cabinet KY Div. of Forestry, KY Personnel Board, Aarika Mack-Brown, filed by Christopher Dalton Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 tendered Summonses (incomplete)) (CDF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2019: #3 additional (incomplete) summons forms) (CDF).
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Legal Assistance by Plaintiff Christopher Dalton Thomas, pro se (JWM)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Christopher Dalton Thomas, pro se (JWM)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David L. Barnhardt, Energy & Environment Cabinet KY Div. of Forestry, KY Personnel Board, Aarika Mack-Brown, filed by Christopher Dalton Thomas, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Barnhardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EEOC AJ Aarika Mack-Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KY Personnel Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy & Environment Cabinet KY Div. of Forestry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Barnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Dalton Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?