United States of America v. Hudson et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Barbara K. Hudson and Unknown Spouse of Barbara K. Hudson
Not Yet Classified: Warning Order Attorney
Case Number: 1:2019cv00167
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 12/20/2019 granting #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. R. Scott Wilder is hereby granted leave to withdraw as attorney of record for the Plaintiff, United States of America. cc: Counsel; Defendant Barbara Hudson (CDF) Modified distribution on 12/21/2019 (CDF).
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARBARA K. HUDSON Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 12/3/2019 granting #6 Warning Order. Attorney David F. Broderick for Warning Order Attorney appointed. cc: Counsel; Defendant(s) (CDF)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re R. Scott Wilder. (Continue to receive notice:Yes) by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dixon, Melissa)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to R. Scott Wilder re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/23/2019. (KJA)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment for Unknown Spouse of Barbara Hudson by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney, Melissa R. Dixon, #2 Proposed Order) (Dixon, Melissa)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Barbara K. Hudson served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Dixon, Melissa)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 11/14/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Barbara K. Hudson. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against Barbara K. Hudson and Unknown Spouse of Barbara K. Hudson, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B-Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C-Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #5 Exhibit D-Affidavit of Kimberly Williamson, #6 Exhibit E-Field Inspection, #7 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hudson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara K. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse of Barbara K. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Melissa R. Dixon
Represented By: R. Scott Wilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Warning Order Attorney
Represented By: David F. Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?