United States of America v. Downey-Turner et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Unknown Spouse of Matthew Turner, Unknown Spouse of Janay Downey-Turner, Matthew Turner, City of Franklin and Janay Downey-Turner
Case Number: 1:2019cv00178
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. City of Franklin served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Campbell, William)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by City of Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Lien in LP49, P207, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Lien in LP49, P536, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Lien in LP51, P415, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Mowing Statement) (Crabtree, W.)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 12/05/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Franklin, Janay Downey-Turner, Matthew Turner. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/4/2019) (JWM).
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against Janay Downey-Turner, City of Franklin, Unknown Spouse of Janay Downey-Turner, Matthew Turner, Unknown Spouse of Matthew Turner, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B-Real Estate Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C-Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #5 Exhibit D-Affidavit of Descent, #6 Exhibit E-Lien, #7 Exhibit F-Lien, #8 Exhibit G-Lien, #9 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Downey-Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse of Matthew Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse of Janay Downey-Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Franklin
Represented By: W. Scott Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janay Downey-Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Represented By: Katherine A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?