Jackson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Harold D. Jackson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00185
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 1/17/2020. (MNM)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Packets forwarded to USMS-Louisville for service. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Form) (MNM)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 12/27/2019 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to issue summons for the USMS to serve. cc: Counsel of Record(MNM)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. (JWM)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Harold D. Jackson (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (JWM)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Harold D. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 USM 285) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Timothy D. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold D. Jackson
Represented By: Charles Richard Burchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?