Cundiff v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sylvia A. Cundiff
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00039
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sylvia A. Cundiff as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/2/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Burchett, Charles)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 3/18/2020. (MNM)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lanny King. (MNM)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3051234, filed by Sylvia A. Cundiff. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cundiff v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Timothy D. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia A. Cundiff
Represented By: Charles Richard Burchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?