Fruit of the Loom, Inc. v. Bioworld Merchandising, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fruit of the Loom, Inc.
Defendant: Bioworld Merchandising, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00042
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fruit of the Loom, Inc. (Ames, E.)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Union Underwear Company, Inc. for Fruit of the Loom, Inc.. by Fruit of the Loom, Inc.. (Ames, E.) Modified to edit text/corporate parent on 3/12/2020 (JWM).
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Fruit of the Loom, Inc.. by Fruit of the Loom, Inc.. (Ames, E.)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bioworld Merchandising, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (CDF)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of Amended Summons by Fruit of the Loom, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Ames, E.)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bioworld Merchandising, Inc., filed by Fruit of the Loom, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3058258.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - License Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Amendment to License Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Default, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Termination, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 tendered Summons (incomplete)) (CDF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fruit of the Loom, Inc. v. Bioworld Merchandising, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fruit of the Loom, Inc.
Represented By: E. Kenly Ames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bioworld Merchandising, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?