Tarter Gate Company, LLC v. Tarter CBD, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tarter Gate Company, LLC
Defendant: Tarter Proud, LLC, Tarter CBD, LLC and Joshua Donald Tarter
Case Number: 1:2020cv00114
Filed: July 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 7/31/2020; Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 9:30 AM CT before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. Parties shall conduct meeting required by Rule 26(f) by 8/20/2020 and file their Rule 26 Meeting Report by 9/3/2020. (Review Order in full for specifics, including report and attendance requirements.) cc: Counsel; KL (CDF)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 7/30/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Joshua Donald Tarter, Tarter CBD, LLC, Tarter Proud, LLC. (Merrick, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tarter Gate Company, LLC. Tarter Proud, LLC served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (VanVactor, Zachary)
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Tarter Gate Company, LLC. Amendment to #5 Summons Returned Executed by Tarter Gate Company, LLC. (VanVactor, Zachary)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to Tarter Proud, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (CDF)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tarter Gate Company, LLC. (VanVactor, Zachary)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing of Amended Summons for Issuance to Defendant Tarter Proud, LLC by Tarter Gate Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons (Amended) to Defendant Tarter Proud, LLC) (VanVactor, Zachary)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tarter Gate Company, LLC. Tarter CBD, LLC served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020. (VanVactor, Zachary)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tarter Gate Company, LLC. Joshua Donald Tarter served on 7/9/2020, answer due 7/30/2020. (VanVactor, Zachary)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing or Determination re:Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint, (JWM)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Joshua Donald Tarter, Tarter CBD, LLC, Tarter Proud, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
July 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tarter CBD, LLC, Tarter Proud, LLC, and Joshua Donald Tarter, filed by Tarter Gate Company, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3133813. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Joshua Donald Tarter, #3 Summons Tarter CBD, #4 Summons Tarter Proud) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarter Gate Company, LLC v. Tarter CBD, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarter Proud, LLC
Represented By: Michael C. Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarter CBD, LLC
Represented By: Michael C. Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Donald Tarter
Represented By: Michael C. Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarter Gate Company, LLC
Represented By: David B. Owsley, II
Represented By: Zachary M. VanVactor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?