United States of America v. Lynn et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Any Unknown Spouse of Ema J. Lynn, Ema Jean Lynn, Emma L. Vinson, Emma Jean Lynn, Wallace F. Lynn, Any Unknown Spouse of Wallace F. Lynn, Midland Funding LLC, Legal Recoveries, Inc. and Ema Jean McCormick
Not Classified By Court: Warning Order Attorney
Case Number: 1:2020cv00129
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WARNING ORDER AND ORDER APPOINTING WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 8/27/2020 granting #9 Warning Order. Attorney Christopher D. Minix for Warning Order Attorney appointed for Any Unknown Spouse of Wallace F. Lynn, Any Unknown Spouse of Ema J. Lynn a/k/a Emma Jean Lynn a/k/a Ema Jean McCormick and Emma L. Vinson. cc: Counsel; WOA; Defendant(s) (CDF)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment for Any Unknown Spouse of Wallace F. Lynn, and Any Unknown Spouse of Ema J. Lynn a/k/a Emma Jean Lynn a/k/a Ema Jean McCormick and Emma L. Vinson by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Issuance, #2 Proposed Order) (Campbell, William)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Legal Recoveries, Inc. served on 8/8/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Campbell, William)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Wallace F. Lynn served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Campbell, William)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Ema Jean Lynn served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. (Campbell, William)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Midland Funding LLC served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. (Campbell, William)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 7/30/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Legal Recoveries, Inc., Ema Jean Lynn, Wallace F. Lynn, Midland Funding LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against Wallace F. Lynn, Any Unknown Spouse of Wallace F. Lynn, Ema Jean Lynn, Any Unknown Spouse of Ema J. Lynn, Legal Recoveries, Inc., and Midland Funding LLC, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-First Note, #3 Exhibit B-First Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C-Assumption Agreement, #5 Exhibit D-Second Note, #6 Exhibit E-Second Mortgage, #7 Exhibit F-Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #8 Exhibit G-Judgment Lien, #9 Exhibit H-Judgment Lien, #10 Exhibit I-Judgment Lien, #11 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lynn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Unknown Spouse of Ema J. Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ema Jean Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emma L. Vinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emma Jean Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace F. Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Unknown Spouse of Wallace F. Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal Recoveries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ema Jean McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Represented By: Katherine A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Warning Order Attorney
Represented By: Christopher D. Minix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?