Otterson v. Bates et al
Plaintiff: Derek Matthew Otterson
Defendant: Samantha Costello, Charles Bates and Billy Begley
Case Number: 1:2020cv00137
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 Response to #5 Notice of Deficiency filed by Derek Matthew Otterson. (Attachments: #1 signed signature page to DN #4 & envelope) (CDF)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency re #4 Supplement. Reason for Deficiency: Filing is not signed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 10/21/2020. (CDF)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint, by Derek Matthew Otterson. (CDF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2020: #1 signed signature page (with envelope) received 9/28/2020) (CDF).
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Expedite Ruling by Plaintiff Derek Matthew Otterson (CDF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles Bates, Samantha Costello, Billy Begley, filed by Derek Matthew Otterson. (Filing fee $400, receipt number B33002135.) (Attachments: #1 Complaint continuation, #2 Statement of Claims, #3 cover letter, #4 miscellaneous attachment, #5 exhibits, #6 Detailed Release Reports, #7 tendered Summonses, #8 miscellaneous, #9 envelope) (CDF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otterson v. Bates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Begley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Matthew Otterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?