United States of America v. Unknown Spouse of Rosemarie Clemons et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Unknown Heirs of Rosemarie Clemons, Ellamae Stephan, Leroy Nichols, Unknown Spouses of Unknown Heirs of Rosemarie Clemons, Danny Stephan, Unknown Spouse of Rosemarie Clemons, Lisa Nichols and City of Glasgow, KY
Not Classified By Court: Warning Order Attorney
Case Number: 1:2020cv00138
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #14 Notice (Other); Error: Incorrect docketing event selected. Document should have been filed using the "Warning Order Attorney Report" event. Proposed Order incorrectly attached.; Correction: Docket event text edited and Proposed Order removed and attached to the Motion for Warning Order Attorney Fees at DN #15 . (CDF)
October 13, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #13 Warning Order Attorney Report; Error: Attached Motion, Affidavit, Exhibit, and Proposed Order should have been filed separately as a Motion for Attorney Fees.; Correction: Motion, Affidavit, Exhibit, and Proposed Order removed from DN #13 and filed at DN #16 as a Motion for Warning Order Attorney Fees. (CDF)
October 12, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Warning Order Attorney Fees and Discharge from Further Responsibility by Warning Order Attorney Paul T. Lawless, re #13 . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Warning Order Attorney Fees, #2 Exhibit - Statement of Attorney Fees, #3 Proposed Order) (NOTE: This filing was previously filed as attachments to the Report of Warning Order Attorney at DN #13 .) (CDF)
October 12, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Discharge from Responsibility by Miscellaneous Warning Order Attorney (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Fee) (Young, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2020: #2 Proposed Order) (CDF).
October 12, 2020 Filing 14 WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY REPORT by Warning Order Attorney Robert A. Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Obituary of R. Clemons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Letter to R. Huff, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Letter to Matthew Nicholas, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Letter to Mary Nicholas, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Letter to T. Burke, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Letter to Unknown Heirs, # 7 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Young, Robert) Modified event text on 10/13/2020 (CDF).
October 12, 2020 Filing 13 WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY REPORT (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Motion for Warning Order Attorney Fees and to be Discharged, # 2 Affidavit in Support of Warning Order Attorney Fees, # 3 Exhibit Statement of Attorney Fees, # 4 Proposed Order Awarding Warning order Attorney's Fees and Discharging) by Warning Order Attorney. (Lawless, Paul)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Danny Stephan served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020; Ellamae Stephan served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Dixon, Melissa)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. City of Glasgow, KY served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Leroy Nichols served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Lisa Nichols served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Dixon, Melissa)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF APPOINTMENT OF WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY FOR THE DEFENDANT UNKNOWN SPOUSES OF UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ROSEMARIE CLEMONS Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 8/21/2020 granting #6 Warning Order. Attorney Paul Thomas Lawless for Warning Order Attorney appointed. cc: Counsel; WOA; Defendant(s) (CDF)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF APPOINTMENT OF WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY FOR THE DEFENDANT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROSEMARIE CLEMONS Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 8/21/2020 granting #5 Warning Order. Attorney Mark David Alcott for Warning Order Attorney appointed. cc: Counsel; WOA; Defendant(s) (CDF)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF APPOINTMENT OF WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY FOR THE DEFENDANT UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ROSEMARIE CLEMONS Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 8/21/2020 granting #4 Warning Order. Attorney Robert Arthur Young for Unknown Heirs of Rosemarie Clemons appointed. cc: Counsel; WOA; Defendant(s) (CDF)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 8/21/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment for Defendant, Unknown Spouses of Unknown Heirs of Rosemarie Clemons by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney, Melissa R. Dixon, #2 Proposed Order) (Dixon, Melissa)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment for Defendant, Unknown Spouse of Rosemarie Clemons by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney, Melissa R. Dixon, #2 Proposed Order) (Dixon, Melissa)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment for Defendant, Unknown Heirs of Rosemarie Clemons by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney, Melissa R. Dixon, #2 Proposed Order) (Dixon, Melissa)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Glasgow, KY, Leroy Nichols, Lisa Nichols, Danny Stephan, Ellamae Stephan, Unknown Heirs of Rosemarie Clemons, Unknown Spouse of Rosemarie Clemons, and Unknown Spouses of Unknown Heirs of Rosemarie Clemons. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summonses. (SRH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (SRH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN REM, filed by United States of America, against Unknown Spouse of Rosemarie Clemons, Unknown Heirs of Rosemarie Clemons, Unknown Spouses of Unknown Heirs of Rosemarie Clemons, Ellamae Stephan, Danny Stephan, Leroy Nichols, Lisa Nichols, and City of Glasgow, KY. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3165674. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B- Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C- Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Exhibit D- Promissory Note, #5 Exhibit E- Obituary, #6 Exhibit F- Affidavit, #7 Exhibit G- Affidavit, #8 Exhibit H- Field Inspection, #9 Exhibit I- Lien, #10 Cover Sheet, #11 Summons tendered) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Unknown Spouse of Rosemarie Clemons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs of Rosemarie Clemons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellamae Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouses of Unknown Heirs of Rosemarie Clemons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse of Rosemarie Clemons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Glasgow, KY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Melissa R. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Warning Order Attorney
Represented By: Mark David Alcott
Represented By: Paul Thomas Lawless
Represented By: Robert Arthur Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?