Alvey v. Bowling Green Police Department
Plaintiff: Curtis Edward Alvey, Jr.
Defendant: Bowling Green Police Department
Case Number: 1:2020cv00143
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Bowling Green Police Department (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Cook, Matthew)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (filed on proper form) by Plaintiff Curtis Edward Alvey, Jr. (CDF)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 Response to #4 Notice of Deficiency - Complaint (proper form) filed by Curtis Edward Alvey, Jr. (Attachments: #1 completed Summons, #2 Motion IFP (proper form)) (CDF)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Reason for Deficiency: Filings are not on correct forms. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/23/2020. (CDF)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Curtis Edward Alvey, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (CDF)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bowling Green Police Department, filed by Curtis Edward Alvey, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (CDF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2020: #2 Complaint on Complaint for a Civil Case form (received 8/25/2020), #3 form instructions (received 8/25/2020)) (CDF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2020: #4 Complaint on proper form (filed 8/27/2020), #5 completed Summons form (received 8/27/2020)) (CDF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvey v. Bowling Green Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowling Green Police Department
Represented By: Hillary M. Hightower
Represented By: Thomas N. Kerrick
Represented By: Matthew Porter Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Edward Alvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?