Anderson et al v. The United States of America
Plaintiff: Jonathan Anderson and Holly Johnson
Defendant: The United States of America and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00157
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Response to #4 Notice of Deficiency, attorney is admitted to practice in our Court, attorney was added under incorrect name. Nothing further needs to be done to comply with deficiency notice. (KJA)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Kelli Lester re #1 Complaint,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice or admission to practice in court. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 10/2/2020. (KJA)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The United States of America. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summonses. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons Issued as to U.S. Postmaster General) (DLW)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (DLW)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The United States of America. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3179328, filed by Jonathan Anderson and Holly Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered - U.S. Attorney General, #3 Summons Tendered - U.S. Attorney, #4 Summons Tendered - U.S. Postmaster General) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Anderson
Represented By: Kelli Lester
Represented By: Taryn K. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Johnson
Represented By: Kelli Lester
Represented By: Taryn K. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?