Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Gaddco, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Defendant: Gaddco, Inc., Allen Gaddis, United States of America Internal Revenue Service, German-American Bank and Tonia Gaddis
Case Number: 1:2020mc00003
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Thomason on behalf of German-American Bank (Thomason, Richard)
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 Summonses Re-Issued as to United States of America Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF AMENDED SUMMONS by Cincinnati Insurance Company re #1 Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Baine, Neil)
October 27, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335). Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Deposit filed by German-American Bank. (Bachert, Scott)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by German-American Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Bachert, Scott)
October 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Bachert on behalf of German-American Bank (Bachert, Scott)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 Summonses Issued as to United States of America Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cincinnati Insurance Company re #1 Complaint,, Summons Attorney General DC (Baine, Neil)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cincinnati Insurance Company re #1 Complaint,, Summons US Attorney WDKY (Baine, Neil)
October 2, 2020 Filing fee received: $47, receipt number L33064958. $400 filing fee (Interpleader Complaint) returned to plaintiff on 10/2/20. (SRH)
October 1, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number L33064955. (SRH)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335), by Plaintiff Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (SRH) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/2/2020) (SRH). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/2/2020) (SRH).
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for Cincinnati Insurance Company. (SRH) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/2/2020) (SRH).
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (SRH) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/2/2020) (SRH).
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 INTERPLEADER COMPLAINT, filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, against Gaddco, Inc., Allen Gaddis, Tonia Gaddis, German-American Bank, and United States of America Internal Revenue Service. Filing fee $400, receipt number L33064955. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Cover Sheet, #10 Addendum to Civil Cover Sheet) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/2/2020) (SRH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Gaddco, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaddco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Gaddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: German-American Bank
Represented By: Richard A. Thomason
Represented By: Scott A. Bachert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonia Gaddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Carmen C. Sarge
Represented By: Neil P. Baine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?