DeCuir v. CRM Development Company et al
Plaintiff: Brett DeCuir
Defendant: CRM Development Company doing business as CRM Companies and Dropping Bird 16, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00040
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AGREED ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 5/6/2021 granting #22 Proposed Agreed Order. Plaintiff shall file response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dn #19 ) by 5/28/2021. cc: Counsel(JWM)
May 5, 2021 Filing 22 Proposed Agreed Order by Brett DeCuir. (Alexander, William)
April 16, 2021 Filing 21 Proposed Order of Dismissal and Referral to Arbitration re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CRM Development Company, Dropping Bird 16, L.L.C.. (Marino, Kara)
April 16, 2021 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CRM Development Company, Dropping Bird 16, L.L.C.. (Marino, Kara)
April 16, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants CRM Development Company, Dropping Bird 16, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Garyen Denning, Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1-A ICIMS login, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1-B ICIMS Welcome Email, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1-C Handbook Acknowledgement, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 1-D Employee Handbook and Policy Manual, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 1-E Mutual Agreement to Arbitrate, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 1-F Dropping Bird Security Update - Manager, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 1-G Shift Manager Schedules, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 1-H Time Punches, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 1-I Payroll Records, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 1-J Time Punches - Training, #13 Affidavit Affidavit of James Beaucham, Exhibit 2) (Marino, Kara) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/19/2021: #14 Proposed Order) (JWM).
April 9, 2021 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT re #16 Summons Returned Executed by Brett DeCuir. (Alexander, William)
April 8, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brett DeCuir. CRM Development Company served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. (Alexander, William)
April 8, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brett DeCuir. Dropping Bird 16, L.L.C. served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. (Alexander, William)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AGREED ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/6/2021 granting #14 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendants are granted leave of Court to file their responsive pleading through 4/16/2021. cc: Counsel(JWM)
April 6, 2021 Filing 14 Proposed Agreed Order extending time to file responsive pleading by CRM Development Company, Dropping Bird 16, L.L.C.. (Marino, Kara)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/5/2021 granting #9 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendants are granted leave of the Court to file their responsive pleading through 4/9/2021. cc: Counsel(JWM)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/5/2021 granting #8 Motion for William Clifton "Clif" Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice cc: Counsel(JWM)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/5/2021 granting #7 Motion for Carter T. Hastings to Appear Pro Hac Vice cc: Counsel(JWM)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/5/2021 granting #6 Motion for Austin W. Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice cc: Counsel(JWM)
April 2, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Agreed Order Granting Leave to File Responsive Pleading through April 9, 2021 by CRM Development Company, Dropping Bird 16, L.L.C.. (Marino, Kara)
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for William Clifton Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3316482. by Plaintiff Brett DeCuir (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Gilday, Anne)
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Carter T. Hastings to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3316456. by Plaintiff Brett DeCuir (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) (Gilday, Anne)
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Austin W. Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3316412. by Plaintiff Brett DeCuir (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Gilday, Anne)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 3/15/2021 granting #4 Motion to Strike and Substitute. Exhibit 1 of Plaintiff's Original Collective and Class Action Complaint (DN No. #1 -1) shall be stricken from the record and that Exhibit 1 of the Motion (ECF No. #4 -1) shall substitute and replace Exhibit 1 of the Plaintiff's Original Collective and Class Action Complaint. cc: Counsel; Clif Alexander (JWM) Modified to edit distribution on 3/15/2021 (JWM).
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Strike and Substitute #1 Complaint,. Document or Part to be Stricken and/or Substituted: Exhibit 1 by Plaintiff Brett DeCuir (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brett DeCuir Consent to Join, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Carter T. Hastings, #3 Proposed Order) (Alexander, William)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to CRM Development Company, Dropping Bird 16, L.L.C.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COLLECTIVE AND CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against CRM Development Company, Dropping Bird 16, L.L.C., filed by Brett DeCuir. Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 0644-3302155. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Written Consent of Brett DeCuir, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (JWM) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/15/2021) (JWM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeCuir v. CRM Development Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett DeCuir
Represented By: Anne L. Gilday
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: Clif Alexander
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRM Development Company doing business as CRM Companies
Represented By: Meredith Schuh Fannin
Represented By: Kara R. Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dropping Bird 16, L.L.C.
Represented By: Meredith Schuh Fannin
Represented By: Kara R. Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?