The Fiscal Court of Adair County et al v. McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Adair County, The Fiscal Court of Allen County, The Fiscal Court of Bullitt County, The Fiscal Court of Carlisle County, The Fiscal Court of Christian County, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government, The Fiscal Court of Cumberland County, The Fiscal Court of Henderson County, The Fiscal Court of Hopkins County, The Fiscal Court of Marshall County, The Fiscal Court of Oldham County and The Fiscal Court of Union County
Defendant: McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00156
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Remark: Case transferred from Kentucky Western has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:21-cv-09923, filed 12/22/2021. (MLG)
December 21, 2021 Filing 14 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. CTO-19 from ND/CA re MDL 2996. (KJA)
December 16, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency L.J. Hollenbach, III re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: attorney not an ECF Registered filer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/4/2022. (KJA)
December 6, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Russell W. Budd re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/20/2021. (KJA)
December 6, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Peter J. Mougey re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/20/2021. (KJA)
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Mark P. Pifko re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/20/2021. (KJA)
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to James C. Peterson re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/20/2021. (KJA)
December 6, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to James L. Magazine re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/20/2021. (KJA)
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to J. Burton LeBlanc re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/20/2021. (KJA)
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Christine Cooney Mansour re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/23/2021. (KJA)
December 6, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Charles G. Orr re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/23/2021. (KJA)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Anthony J. Majestro re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/23/2021. (KJA)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. (CDF)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF)
November 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McKinsey and Company, Inc., filed by The Fiscal Court of Adair County, The Fiscal Court of Allen County, The Fiscal Court of Bullitt County, The Fiscal Court of Carlisle County, The Fiscal Court of Christian County, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government, The Fiscal Court of Cumberland County, The Fiscal Court of Henderson County, The Fiscal Court of Hopkins County, The Fiscal Court of Marshall County, The Fiscal Court of Oldham County, The Fiscal Court of Union County. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3476846.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (CDF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Fiscal Court of Adair County et al v. McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Adair County
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: Louis J. Hollenbach
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P. Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Allen County
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: Louis J. Hollenbach
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P. Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Bullitt County
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: Louis J. Hollenbach
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P. Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Carlisle County
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: Louis J. Hollenbach
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P. Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Christian County
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: Louis J. Hollenbach
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P. Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: Louis J. Hollenbach
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P. Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Cumberland County
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: Louis J. Hollenbach
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P. Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Henderson County
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: Louis J. Hollenbach
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P. Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Hopkins County
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: Louis J. Hollenbach
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P. Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Marshall County
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: Louis J. Hollenbach
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P. Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Oldham County
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: Louis J. Hollenbach
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P. Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Union County
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: Louis J. Hollenbach
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P. Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?