Shannon v. Combe Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Mark Shannon
Defendant: Combe Incorporated, Combe Product, Inc, Combe Laboratories, Inc and Combe International LTD
Case Number: 1:2023cv00056
Filed: April 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Mark Shannon. (JM)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Combe Incorporated, Combe International LTD, Combe Laboratories, Inc, Combe Product, Inc, filed by Mark Shannon. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (JM)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Response to #9 Notice of Deficiency, filed by Mark Shannon. Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint and IFP motion (See DNs #11 and #12 .) (JM)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to GO 23-06, this matter is reassigned to the docket of Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. for all further proceedings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel, plaintiff pro se, CM-McKinley (KJA)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Reason for Deficiency: Documents need to be submitted on correct forms (Complaint, IFP); Filing fee to be paid if no IFP filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/1/2023. (CDL)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint - missing summons. (CDL)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (KJA)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Eastern; Case Number 5:23-cv-00084. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (KJA)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This action (including all pending motions) are TRANSFERRED to the Bowling Green Division of the United States District Court for the Western District of Kentucky pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 04/26/2023. (DC) cc: COR, Strike Team and Mark Shannon by US Mail [Transferred from kyed on 4/27/2023.]
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Mark Shannon, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope dated 3-29-23)(KCF) [Transferred from kyed on 4/27/2023.]
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #4 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Mark Shannon, pro se. (KCF) [Transferred from kyed on 4/27/2023.]
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(KMP) [Transferred from kyed on 4/27/2023.]
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED)., filed by Mark Shannon, pro se. No filing fee or IFP paperwork received. (Attachments: #1 envelope postmarked 3/15/2023)(KMP) [Transferred from kyed on 4/27/2023.]
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #1 Complaint (KMP) [Transferred from kyed on 4/27/2023.]
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (KMP) [Transferred from kyed on 4/27/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shannon v. Combe Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe Product, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe Laboratories, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe International LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?