Briggs v. Story et al
Plaintiff: Larry Briggs
Defendant: Charles Story and Peek Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00057
Filed: April 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2024 Filing 13 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Larry Briggs. (Kilgore, J.)
May 21, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency to J. Patrick Kilgore, counsel for Larry Briggs. Reason for Deficiency: Missing Rule 7.1(a)(2) disclosure statement. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/28/2024. (TJD)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER from telephonic scheduling conference held before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 5/16/2024. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 5/16/2024. Plaintiff Joinder of Parties due by 6/2/2025. Plaintiff Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2025. Defendants Joinder of Parties due by 6/2/2025. Defendant Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2025. Fact Discovery due by 5/30/2025. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 7/25/2025. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 9/30/2025. Expert Discovery due by 12/12/2025. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/22/2025 at 9:30 AM CST before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. The Court will initiate the call. Dispositive Motions due by 1/16/2026. Daubert Motion due by 1/16/2026. cc: counsel (KDY)
April 24, 2024 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Peek Trucking, LLC, Charles Story. (Willard, Jessica)
April 5, 2024 Filing 9 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Peek Trucking, LLC and Charles Storey. (Fiorella, Jennifer) Modified filers on 4/8/2024 (TJD).
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (EBOC) by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/5/2024. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/16/2024 at 9:30 AM CDT/10:30 AM EDT before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. The Court to initiate the call. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. Counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties by 4/25/2024. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/9/2024. See Order for details. cc: counsel, K.Lovell-CM (DeW)
April 5, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and in accordance with Rule 73(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that a United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or non-jury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. You may consent to have your case referred to a Magistrate Judge, or you may withhold your consent without adverse consequences. Should all parties consent to having a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, please complete the #Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge and send a copy of this document to the clerks office via regular mail or email at # intake-kywECF@kywd.uscourts.gov. (TJD)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/5/2024; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
April 4, 2024 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE to Simpson Circuit Court and Counsel of Record/Parties re #1 Notice of Removal. (HMC)
April 4, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. Reason for Deficiency: No Rule 7.1(a)(2) Diversity Disclosure Statement. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 4/18/2024. (HMC)
April 4, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Other Affiliate Charles Story for Peek Trucking, LLC. (HMC)
April 4, 2024 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (HMC)
April 4, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Charles Story, Peek Trucking, LLC from Simpson Circuit Court, case number 23-CI-00248. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AKYWDC-4008127) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to Plaintiff's Counsel) (HMC)
April 4, 2024 ANSWER to Complaint filed in Simpson Circuit Court (see DN #1 -2) by Peek Trucking, LLC, Charles Story. (HMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briggs v. Story et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Briggs
Represented By: J. Patrick Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Story
Represented By: Daniel E. Murner
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Winchell
Represented By: Estee Rose
Represented By: Jennifer L. Fiorella
Represented By: Zonya Myers
Represented By: Jessica Lauren Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peek Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Daniel E. Murner
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Winchell
Represented By: Estee Rose
Represented By: Jennifer L. Fiorella
Represented By: Zonya Myers
Represented By: Jessica Lauren Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?