Agyei v. Petty
Plaintiff: Prince Agyei
Defendant: Gary Petty, National General Insurance Company and Direct Auto Insurance
Case Number: 1:2024cv00064
Filed: April 25, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 mv Removal- Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2024 Schedules: Expert Discovery due by 6/30/2025. (TJD)
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/13/2024. Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 1/13/2025; Fact Discovery due by 6/30/2025. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 3/3/2025; Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 4/15/2025; Dispositive/Daubert Motion due by 8/15/2025; Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/7/2025 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. cc: counsel (JM)
May 23, 2024 Filing 8 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Gary Petty. (Klapheke, David)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (EBOC) by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/30/2024. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling conference set for 6/13/2024 at 9:30 AM CDT/10:30 AM EDT before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. Counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties by 5/23/2024. Rule 26 meeting report due by 6/6/2024. See Order for details.cc: counsel, HBB-CM (KDY)
April 29, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and in accordance with Rule 73(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that a United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or non-jury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. You may consent to have your case referred to a Magistrate Judge, or you may withhold your consent without adverse consequences. Should all parties consent to having a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, please complete the #Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge and send a copy of this document to the clerks office via regular mail or email at # intake-kywECF@kywd.uscourts.gov. (TJD)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/29/2024; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
April 26, 2024 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Hart Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
April 25, 2024 Filing 3 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Gary Petty. (DJT)
April 25, 2024 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (DJT)
April 25, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER FILED] by Gary Petty from Hart Circuit Court, case number 24-CI-20. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number CKYWDC-4021597, filed by Gary Petty. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Record) (DJT)
April 25, 2024 ANSWER with Jury Demand filed in Hart Circuit Court (See DN #1 -2 for full viewing) by Gary Petty. (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agyei v. Petty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince Agyei
Represented By: Sean P. Tillman
Represented By: Sean Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Petty
Represented By: David T. Klapheke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National General Insurance Company
Represented By: William K. Burnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Auto Insurance
Represented By: William K. Burnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?